MALIBU MEDIA, LLC v. DOE
Plaintiff: MALIBU MEDIA, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Case Number: 2:2019cv03059
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE A THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(F) CONFERENCE (DOC. NO. #7 ) IS GRANTED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 8/14/2019.8/15/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 Memorandum re #7 First MOTION for Leave to File To Serve Third Party Subpoena filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(FIORE, CHRISTOPHER)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 First MOTION for Leave to File To Serve Third Party Subpoena filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(FIORE, CHRISTOPHER)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC re #5 Memorandum, (FIORE, CHRISTOPHER)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 Memorandum re #4 First MOTION for Leave to File To Serve Third Party Subpoena filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(FIORE, CHRISTOPHER) *FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; SEE 19-3060 FOR CORRECT CASE* Modified on 8/1/2019 (lisad, ).
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 First MOTION for Leave to File To Serve Third Party Subpoena filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(FIORE, CHRISTOPHER) *FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; SEE 19-3060 FOR CORRECT CASE* Modified on 8/1/2019 (lisad, ).
July 12, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC. (jwl, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Copy of Form to Register of Copyrights. (jwl, ) (Main Document 3 replaced on 7/15/2019) (jwl, ).
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC.(jwl, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 200407.), filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Track Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MALIBU MEDIA, LLC v. DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MALIBU MEDIA, LLC
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER P. FIORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?