WALKER v. SAUL
Plaintiff: LATASHA ARNITA WALKER
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv03077
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: LINDA K CARACAPPA
Referring Judge: GERALD A MCHUGH
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service by U.S.MARSHALL SERVICE re: served SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT upon ATTORNEY GENERAL; COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY by CERTIFIED MAIL (jl, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (amas)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE LINDA K. CARACAPPA FOR A REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 7/19/2019. 7/22/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 Standing Procedural Order. 7/22/19 Entered and copies e-mailed. (kw, )
July 19, 2019 (3) Summons Issued as to ANDREW M. SAUL. Forwarded To: U.S. Marshal on 7/22/19. (kw, )
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ISSUE SUMMONSES. THE U.S. MARSHAL FOR THE E.D. OF PA SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONSES AND THE COMPLAINT IN ACCORDANCE WITH F.R.C.P. 4(i), ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 7/19/19.7/22/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE COURT'S STANDING ORDER FOR DIRECT ASSIGNMENT OF SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES PILOT PROGRAM AND PLAINTIFF HAVING DECLINED CONSENT, THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS RANDOMLY REASSIGNED FROM MAGISTRATE JUDGE LINDA K. CARACAPPA TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH, DISTRICT JUDGE, FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 7/18/2019. 7/19/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(dmc, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 Social Security Declining Magistrate Consent by LATASHA ARNITA WALKER.. (GORNSTEIN, SHARON)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 Consent to Assignment SS Case)(jwl, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against ANDREW M. SAUL, filed by LATASHA ARNITA WALKER.(jwl, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAV ETO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by LATASHA ARNITA WALKER..(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WALKER v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LATASHA ARNITA WALKER
Represented By: SHARON GORNSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?