CONTE et al v. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: TERESA CONTE and JOHN CONTE
Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv03080
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: ANITA B BRODY
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing: PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED TO 10/1/2019, AT 2:00 P.M. IN JUDGE CHAMBERS ROOM 7613 7TH FLOOR BEFORE THE HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY. 9/9/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(miah, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Hearing:A RULE 16 CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 9/25/2019 AT 02:00 PM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS, ROOM 7613 ON THE 7TH FLOOR, BEFORE HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY.9/3/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (PETKA, JOSEPH)
August 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH W. PETKA on behalf of STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (PETKA, JOSEPH)
July 18, 2019 1 Summons Issued as to STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. Forwarded To: PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL on 7/18/2019 (sg, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 200462.), filed by JOHN CONTE, TERESA CONTE.EXHIBIT. (Attachments: #1 EXHIBIT, #2 COVER SHEETS)(sg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CONTE et al v. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JOSEPH W. PETKA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERESA CONTE
Represented By: RICHARD A. GODSHALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN CONTE
Represented By: RICHARD A. GODSHALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?