DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST COMPANY AMERICAS v. HENRY et al
Plaintiff: DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST COMPANY AMERICAS
Defendant: JAMES E. HENRY, III, JAMES E. HENRY and PAULETTE R. HENRY
Case Number: 2:2019cv03095
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CHAD F KENNEY
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Certified Copy of Order, dated 9/4/2019, along with docket entries, mailed to the Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County on 9/12/2019. (md)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT PLFF'S MOTION TO REMAND (ECF NO. 6) IS GRANTED, ETC. THIS CASE IS REMANDED TO THE PHILADELPHIA COUNTY COURT OF COMMON PLEAS. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO CLOSE THIS MATTER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 9/4/19.9/4/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED TO PRO SE AND UNREPRESENTED PARTY.(kw, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand CASE TO THE PHILADELPHIA COUNTY COURT OF COMMON PLEAS filed by DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST COMPANY AMERICAS.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Certificate of Service)(PERSUN, LAURA)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by LAURA JEAN PERSUN on behalf of DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST COMPANY AMERICAS (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service for Notice of Appearance)(PERSUN, LAURA)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT HENRY'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (IFP) IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS OUTLINED HEREIN. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SEND HENRY AN APPROPRIATE NON-PRISONER APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP. IF HENRY SEEKS TO PROCEED IFP HE SHALL, WITHIN 30 DAYS, EITHER COMPLETE THE IFP FORM, OR PAY THE $400 FILING FEE TO THE CLERK OF COURT, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 7/19/2019.7/19/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE WITH IFP FORMS.(amas)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (jwl, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JAMES E. HENRY, III from Common Pleas Philadelphia, case number 190102105. (jwl, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by JAMES E. HENRY, III..(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST COMPANY AMERICAS v. HENRY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES E. HENRY, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES E. HENRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAULETTE R. HENRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST COMPANY AMERICAS
Represented By: JESSICA NICOLE MANIS
Represented By: LAURA JEAN PERSUN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?