PROGRESSIVE NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY v. MOTOROLA SOLUTIONS, INC.
Plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: WADDELL COMMUNICATIONS AND SHAWN WADDELL
3Rd Party Plaintiff: MOTOROLA SOLUTIONS, INC.
3Rd Party Defendant: WADDELL COMMUNICATIONS
Case Number: 2:2019cv03117
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MARK A KEARNEY
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER THAT AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE VIA TELEPHONE ON 3/18/20 AT 8:45 A.M.; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 3/2/20. 3/3/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS IS DENIED AND DEFENDANTS SHALL ANSWER THE COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN 3/16/20; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 3/2/20. 3/2/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
February 28, 2020 Filing 54 RESPONSE in Opposition re #51 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint, in Part, Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) filed by PROGRESSIVE NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(HUNT, ANDREW)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 CONFERENCE ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 4/29/20 AT 9:30 A.M.; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY ON 2/25/20. 2/25/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
February 25, 2020 Filing 52 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY Pretrial Conference VIA TELEPHONE held on 2/25/20. (jl, )
February 14, 2020 Filing 51 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint, in Part, Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) filed by WADDELL COMMUNICATIONS, WADDELL COMMUNICATIONS AND SHAWN WADDELL.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(LEGROW, BRIAN)
February 5, 2020 Filing 50 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY Pretrial Conference via Telephone held on 2/5/20. (jl, )
February 5, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE of Hearing: A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE REGARDING THE CASE STATUS WILL BE HELD WITH COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS ON TUESDAY, FEBRUARY 25, 2020 AT 9:00 AM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY. COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO INITIATE THE CALL. JUDGE HEFFLEY CAN BE REACHED AT 267-299-7420.(sah)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER THAT WADDELL COMMUNICATIONS AND SHAWN WADDELL UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONTINUE IS GRANTED AND DEFENDANTS SHALL RESPOND TO THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINTS BY 2/14/20; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 2/3/20. 2/3/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
February 3, 2020 Filing 47 MOTION to Continue Uncontested filed by WADDELL COMMUNICATIONS, WADDELL COMMUNICATIONS AND SHAWN WADDELL, WADDELL COMMUNICATIONS AND SHAWN WADDELL.Certificate of Service.(LEGROW, BRIAN)
January 31, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN C. LEGROW on behalf of WADDELL COMMUNICATIONS, WADDELL COMMUNICATIONS AND SHAWN WADDELL, WADDELL COMMUNICATIONS AND SHAWN WADDELL with Certificate of Service(LEGROW, BRIAN)
January 31, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN PHILIP MORGENSTERN on behalf of WADDELL COMMUNICATIONS, WADDELL COMMUNICATIONS AND SHAWN WADDELL, WADDELL COMMUNICATIONS AND SHAWN WADDELL with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(MORGENSTERN, JOHN)
January 24, 2020 Filing 44 Letter dated 1/24/20 FROM ULRIKE HEVENER TO ANDREW HUNT RE: CERTAIN STATEMENTS; ETC. (jl, )
January 16, 2020 Filing 43 STATUS REPORT by PROGRESSIVE NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY. (HUNT, ANDREW)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER THAT WE AMEND OUR 10/10/19 ORDER TO DELETE THE PROSPECTIVE OBLIGATIONS AT PARAGRAPHS TEN, 13,14,15, 16,17 AND 18 SUBJECT TO SETTING A TRIAL SCHEDULE FOR THE CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANTS WADDELL COMMUNICATIONS AND SHAWN WADDELL. PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE A STATUS MEMORANDUM NOT EXCEEDING THREE PAGES FILED ON OR BEFORE 1/16/20 DESCRIBING THE PRESENT STATUS OF ITS EFFORTS; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 1/13/20. 1/14/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, MAILED TO UNREP.(jl, )
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b) AS TO DEFENDANT MOTOROLA SOLUTIONS, INC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 1/8/20. 1/8/20 ENTERED AND MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
January 7, 2020 Filing 40 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY Pretrial Conference held on 1/7/20. (jl, )
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER THAT THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 1/13/20 IS CANCELLED; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY ON 1/7/20. 1/7/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
January 7, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Hearing: A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE REGARDING THE CASE STATUS WILL BE HELD WITH COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS ON WEDNESDAY, FEBRUARY 5, 2020 AT 10:00 AM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY. COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO INITIATE THE CALL. JUDGE HEFFLEY CAN BE REACHED AT 267-299-7420.(sah)
January 3, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Hearing: A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE REGARDING THE STATUS OF SETTLEMENT IS SET FOR TUESDAY, JANUARY 7, 2020 AT 9:30 AM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO INITIATE THE CALL. JUDGE HEFFLEY CAN BE REACHED AT 267-299-7420.(sah)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER THAT THE STIPULATION (ECF DOC.NO.35) IS APPROVED AND ALL THIRD PARTY CLAIMS FILED BY MOTOROLA SOLUTIONS, INC. AGAINST WADDELL COMMUNICATIONS ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 1/2/20. 1/2/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
January 2, 2020 Filing 35 STIPULATION of Dismissal Third-Party Complaint Against Waddell Communications Without Prejudice by MOTOROLA SOLUTIONS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(TOMKIN, SARAH)
December 23, 2019 Filing 34 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Sandra Yade re: served Third Amended Complaint and Summons upon Barbara Waddell by Personal Service on 12/19/2019 (HUNT, ANDREW)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S #32 MOTION FOR EXTENSION TO AMEND OUR 12/3/19 ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 12/12/19.12/13/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED. COPY MAILED TO UNREP.(fdc)
December 12, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for Service Deadline extension upon Waddell Communications filed by PROGRESSIVE NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(HUNT, ANDREW)
December 5, 2019 1 AMENDED Summons Issued as to WADDELL COMMUNICATIONS AND SHAWN WADDELL. Forwarded To: ANDREW HUNT on 12/5/19 (jl, )
December 5, 2019 Filing 31 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against WADDELL COMMUNICATIONS AND SHAWN WADDELL, filed by PROGRESSIVE NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY, JURY DEMAND.(jl, )
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. PLAINTIFF IS GRANTED LEAVE TO FILE A THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT BY 12/6/19; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 12/3/19. 12/4/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
December 2, 2019 Filing 29 Memorandum of Law in Support of Opposition re #26 MOTION for Leave to File a Third Amended Complaint filed by MOTOROLA SOLUTIONS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(TOMKIN, SARAH) Modified on 12/3/2019 (fb).
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO EXTEND TO EXTEND DEADLINES (ECF DOC NO. #27 ) IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 11/27/2019.11/27/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd, )
November 27, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by PROGRESSIVE NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HUNT, ANDREW)
November 22, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to File filed by PROGRESSIVE NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(HUNT, ANDREW)
November 21, 2019 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Keith Niziankiewicz re: served Third Party Complaint Summon, Exhibits and Order upon WADDELL COMMUNICATIONS at Usual Abode of Owner of Waddell Communications on November 19, 2019 (TOMKIN, SARAH) Modified on 11/22/2019 (tjd).
November 7, 2019 1 THIRD PARTY Summons Issued as to WADDELL COMMUNICATIONS. Forwarded To: RONALD GILLER on 11/8/19 (jl, )
November 7, 2019 Filing 24 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against WADDELL COMMUNICATIONS, filed by MOTOROLA SOLUTIONS, INC..(jl, )
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S UNCONTESTED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 11/7/19. 11/8/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
November 7, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to File Third-Party Complaint filed by MOTOROLA SOLUTIONS, INC..Memorandum, Declaration Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(TOMKIN, SARAH)
October 17, 2019 Filing 21 STIPULATION of Undisputed Facts by PROGRESSIVE NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY. (HUNT, ANDREW)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CONFERENCE ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 1/13/20 AT 9:30 A.M.; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY ON 10/10/19. 10/10/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER THAT BY 3/4/20 EACH PARTY SHALL FILE A PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM. ALL MOTIONS IN LIMINE ARE DUE BY 3/9/20. A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD TELEPHONICALLY ON 3/19/20 AT 8:45 A.M.. COUNSEL IS ATTACHED FOR JURY SELECTION FOLLOWED BY A FOUR-DAY TRIAL BEGINNING ON 3/23/20 AT 9:00 A.M..SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DAUBERT MOTIONS ARE DUE BY 1/23/20. THIS MATTER IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE HEFFLEY FOR ALL SETTLEMENT PURPOSES. ALL FACT AND EXPERT DISCOVERY SHALL BE SERVED, NOTICED AND COMPLETED BY 1/17/20; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 10/10/19. 10/10/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
October 10, 2019 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY Initial Pretrial TELEPHONE Conference held on 10/10/19 (jl, ) (Main Document 18 replaced on 10/10/2019) (jl, ).
October 8, 2019 Filing 17 Report Of Rule 26(f) Meeting by PROGRESSIVE NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY. (HUNT, ANDREW)
September 27, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by KENNETH T. LEVINE on behalf of PROGRESSIVE NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY(LEVINE, KENNETH)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER THAT AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD VIA TELEPHONE ON 10/10/19 AT 9:30 A.M.; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 9/27/19. 9/27/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
September 26, 2019 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by MOTOROLA SOLUTIONS, INC..(TOMKIN, SARAH)
September 26, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by MOTOROLA SOLUTIONS, INC..(TOMKIN, SARAH)
August 21, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH L. TOMKIN on behalf of MOTOROLA SOLUTIONS, INC., MOTOROLA SOLUTIONS, INC. (TOMKIN, SARAH)
August 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by RONALD A. GILLER on behalf of MOTOROLA SOLUTIONS, INC., MOTOROLA SOLUTIONS, INC. (GILLER, RONALD)
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PROGRESSIVE NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY. MOTOROLA SOLUTIONS, INC. waiver sent (DATE NOT GIVEN). (HUNT, ANDREW) Modified on 8/20/2019 (fb).
July 31, 2019 1 SECOND AMENDED Summons Issued as to MOTOROLA SOLUTIONS, INC.. Forwarded To: ANDREW HUNT on 7/31/19 (jl, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against MOTOROLA SOLUTIONS, INC., filed by PROGRESSIVE NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY, JURY DEMAND.(jl, )
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION IS GRANTED AND TO AVOID MANIFEST INJUSTICE AND IT MAY FILE THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT BY 8/1/19; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 7/30/19. 7/30/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by PROGRESSIVE NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY.Memorandum, Affidavit, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B)(LEVINE, KENNETH)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by KENNETH T. LEVINE on behalf of PROGRESSIVE NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY (LEVINE, KENNETH)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT WE DISMISS THIS CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 7/24/19. 7/24/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, MAILED TO UNREP.(jl, )
July 22, 2019 1 AMENDED Summons Issued as to MOTOROLA SOLUTIONS, INC.. Forwarded To: ANDREW HUNT on 7/23/19 (jl, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against MOTOROLA SOLUTIONS, INC., filed by PROGRESSIVE NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY, JURY DEMAND.(jl, )
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL NO LATER THAN 7/25/19, EITHER (1) FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT PLEADING THE PARTIES CITIZENSHIP OR (2) SHOW CAUSE IN A MEMORANDUM NOT EXCEEDING SEVEN PAGES AS TO WHY WE SHOULD NOT DISMISS ITS CASE FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 7/18/19. 7/18/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, MAILED TO UNREP.(jl, )
July 17, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by PROGRESSIVE NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY. (jwl, )
July 17, 2019 Summons Issued as to MOTOROLA SOLUTIONS, INC.. One Forwarded To: Counsel on 7/17/19 (jwl, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent THE PROGRESSIVE CORPORATION for PROGRESSIVE NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY. by PROGRESSIVE NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY.(jwl, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MOTOROLA SOLUTIONS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 200580.), filed by PROGRESSIVE NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY.(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PROGRESSIVE NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY v. MOTOROLA SOLUTIONS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: MOTOROLA SOLUTIONS, INC.
Represented By: SARAH L. TOMKIN
Represented By: RONALD A. GILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: ANDREW G. HUNT
Represented By: KENNETH T. LEVINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: WADDELL COMMUNICATIONS
Represented By: BRIAN C. LEGROW
Represented By: JOHN PHILIP MORGENSTERN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WADDELL COMMUNICATIONS AND SHAWN WADDELL
Represented By: BRIAN C. LEGROW
Represented By: JOHN PHILIP MORGENSTERN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?