BONNER v. SIPPLE et al
Plaintiff: EUGENE THYE BONNER
Defendant: MR. BURKHOLDER, MS. MANDY SIPPLE, MR. D. HARRIS, MR. FONDI, MR. WORTH, MS. JEANNE WELSH, MS. TAMMY FERGUSON and MS. JENNY
Case Number: 2:2019cv03191
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CYNTHIA M RUFE
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE FORWARDED TO PLAINTIFF ON 9/10/19 RE: WAIVERS(rf, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to DEFENDANTS on 9/10/19. Waiver of Service due by 10/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 WAIVER, #2 WAIVER, #3 WAIVER)(rf, )
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT CLERK OF COURT IS SPECIALLY APPOINTED TO SERVE WRITTEN WAIVER REQUESTS ON THE REMAINING DEFENDANTS, ETC. THE WAIVER REQUESTS SHALL BE ACCOMPANIED BY A COPY OF THE COMPLAINT AND A COPY OF THE COURTS 8/5/19 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (DOC. 6 & 7) AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 9/9/19. 9/11/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO BONNER.(rf, )
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO REFER THIS MATTER TO THE PRISONERS' CIVIL RIGHTS PANEL FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA FOR POSSIBLE APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. FURTHER ORDERED THAT SHOULD COUNSEL BE APPOINTED SUCH COUNSEL IS HEREBY GRANTED LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN 30 DAYS OF APPOINTMENT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 9/10/19. 9/11/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO BONNER.(rf, ) (Main Document 9 replaced on 9/11/2019) (rf, ).
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 Request filed by EUGENE THYE BONNER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mbh, )
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF SHALL POAY THE $350.00 FILING FEE IN INSTALLMENTS; THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO THE SUPERINTENDENT OF SCI PHOENIX; THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED; FOR THE REASONS STATE IN THE COURT'S MEMORANDUM PLAINITFF'S CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANTS HARRIS, BURKHOLDER, FERGUSON WELSH AND SIPPLE ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; WITH THE EXCEPTION OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM THAT SIPPLE WAS DELIBERATELY INDIFFERENT TO HIS SERIOUS MEDICAL NEEDS, THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL TERMINATE DEFENDANTS HARRIS, BURKHOLDER, FERGUSON, WELSH; PLAINTIFF IS GIVEN THIRTY DAYS LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT; UPON THE FILNG OF AN AMENDED COMPLAINT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL NOT MAKE SERVICE UNTIL SO ORDERD BY THE COURT. IF PLAINTIFF FAILS TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT THE COURT WILL DIRECT SERVICE OF HIS INITIAL COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANTS JENNY, WORTH, FONDI AND SIPPLE, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 8/1/19. 8/6/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (jpd )
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 8/1/19. 8/6/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINITFF.(jpd, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL FILED BY EUGENE THYE BONNER.(ahf)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (ahf)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by EUGENE THYE BONNER. (ahf)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against BURKHOLDER, TAMMY FERGUSON, FONDI, D. HARRIS, JENNY, MANDY SIPPLE, JEANNE WELSH, WORTH, filed by EUGENE THYE BONNER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ahf) (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/24/2019) (md, ).
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS FILED BY EUGENE THYE BONNER.(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BONNER v. SIPPLE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MR. BURKHOLDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MS. MANDY SIPPLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MR. D. HARRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MR. FONDI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MR. WORTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MS. JEANNE WELSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MS. TAMMY FERGUSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MS. JENNY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EUGENE THYE BONNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?