FLUDD v. AMERICAN RED CROSS
Plaintiff: DEBORAH FLUDD
Defendant: AMERICAN RED CROSS
Case Number: 2:2019cv03517
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: BERLE M SCHILLER
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by AMERICAN RED CROSS.(ROGIN, ALEXANDRA)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by AMERICAN RED CROSS.(ROGIN, ALEXANDRA)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DEBORAH FLUDD re: Tim Porvaznik served Summons and Complaint upon AMERICAN RED CROSS by Courier. AMERICAN RED CROSS served on 9/11/2019, answer due 10/2/2019. (CHASE, JONATHAN)
August 2, 2019 1 Summons Issued as to AMERICAN RED CROSS. Forwarded To: PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 8/5/2019 (amas)
August 2, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by DEBORAH FLUDD. (amas)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMERICAN RED CROSS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 201580.), filed by DEBORAH FLUDD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, DESIGNATION FORM, CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK FORM)(amas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FLUDD v. AMERICAN RED CROSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBORAH FLUDD
Represented By: JONATHAN W. CHASE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN RED CROSS
Represented By: ALEXANDRA ROGIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?