IN RE: TARANI A. JOHNSON
Appellant: TARANI A. JOHNSON
Trustee: UNITED STATES TRUSTEE and WILLIAM C. MILLER
Case Number: 2:2019cv03620
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 Original Supplemental Bankruptcy record together with designation of record on appeal received. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Record)(nd, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 Briefing Schedule 9/3/2019 Entered and copies mailed to pro se and e-mailed. (ahf)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 Original Bankruptcy record together with designation of record on appeal received. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, Appeal, Order, #2 Designation Part 1, #3 Designation Part 2, #4 Designation Part 3, #5 Designation Part 4, #6 Johnson Claims Register, #7 Claims Part 1, #8 Claims Part 2, #9 Claims Part 3, #10 Claims Part 4)(ahf)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 JUDICIAL NOTICE AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE APPEAL WITHOUT FILING FEE FILED BY TARANI A. JOHNSON. (NO ENVELOPE) (fdc)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (ahf)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 Certificate of Appeal of TARANI A. JOHNSON from the order of Bankruptcy Judge Magdeline D. Coleman filed on 7/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Docket, Notice of Appeal, #2 Civil Cover Sheets)(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE: TARANI A. JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: TARANI A. JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: UNITED STATES TRUSTEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: WILLIAM C. MILLER
Represented By: WILLIAM C. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?