MILES et al v. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA et al
Plaintiff: PAUL MILES and NICOLE MILES
Defendant: JOHN AND MARY DOES, SHIEKETTA TRIPPETT, NASIR MITCHELL, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA and GEICO
Case Number: 2:2019cv03648
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MITCHELL S GOLDBERG
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with affirmative defenses and certificate of service by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA.(COOPER, JONATHAN)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT CITY OF PHILADELPHIA IS GRANTED AN EXTENSION OF TIME, UNTIL 10/8/2019, TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 10/2/2019. 10/3/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(amas)
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 12(b) PROCEDURAL ORDER (sl, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by PAMELA B. HINTON on behalf of GEICO with Jury Demand(HINTON, PAMELA)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Anthony Galasso re: served Summons and Complaint upon Shieketta Trippett on 8/25/19 (WILSON, VAL)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Val Pleet Wilson re: served Summons and Complaint upon Gieco on 8/26/19 (WILSON, VAL)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Mona K Wilson re: served Summons and Complaint upon City of Philadelphia on 8/22/2019 (WILSON, VAL)
August 13, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by NICOLE MILES, PAUL MILES. (ahf)
August 13, 2019 Summons Issued as to CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, GEICO, NASIR MITCHELL, SHIEKETTA TRIPPETT. 4 Given To: Counsel on 8/13/2019 (ahf)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, GEICO, JOHN AND MARY DOES, NASIR MITCHELL, SHIEKETTA TRIPPETT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 202019.), filed by PAUL MILES, NICOLE MILES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MILES et al v. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN AND MARY DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHIEKETTA TRIPPETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NASIR MITCHELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Represented By: JONATHAN COOPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO
Represented By: PAMELA B. HINTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL MILES
Represented By: VAL PLEET WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICOLE MILES
Represented By: VAL PLEET WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?