SAWICKI v. AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: MELODY SAWICKI
Defendant: AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv03738
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GERALD J PAPPERT
Referring Judge: JOHN M YOUNGE
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT TO HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 10/02/2019. 10/02/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN P. DOWNEY on behalf of AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY with Certificate of Service(DOWNEY, BRIAN)
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Aetna, Inc.; CVS Pharmacy, Inc.; CVS Health Corporation with Certificate of Service by AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY.(EINSIG, NATALIE)
August 28, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY waiver sent on 8/27/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (EINSIG, NATALIE)
August 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by NATALIE GRILL EINSIG on behalf of AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY with Certificate of Service(EINSIG, NATALIE)
August 19, 2019 Summons Issued as to AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. 1 Forwarded To: Counsel on 8/20/2019 (ahf)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 202342.), filed by MELODY SAWICKI.(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SAWICKI v. AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: BRIAN P. DOWNEY
Represented By: NATALIE GRILL EINSIG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELODY SAWICKI
Represented By: MICHAEL J. PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?