VAZQUEZ v. STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: FRANCISCO VAZQUEZ, JR.
Defendant: STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv03741
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL M BAYLSON
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing: PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/24/2019 02:45 PM BEFORE HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF WILL INITIATE THE TELEPHONE CONFERENCE AND WHEN ALL COUNSEL ARE ON THE LINE, CALL CHAMBERS AT 267-299-7520. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement)(lds, )
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including StanCorp Financial GRoup, Inc.; Meiji Yasuda Life Ins. Co. with Certificate of Service by STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(AUSTIN, HEATHER)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint together with Affirmative Defenses by STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(AUSTIN, HEATHER)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by FRANCISCO VAZQUEZ, JR. STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY waiver sent on 8/21/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (PARKER, MICHAEL)
August 19, 2019 1 Summons Issued as to STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 8/20/19 (jaa, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE202339.) filed by FRANCISCO VAZQUEZ, JR.(jaa, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VAZQUEZ v. STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCISCO VAZQUEZ, JR.
Represented By: MICHAEL J. PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: HEATHER J. AUSTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?