UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BRISLIN
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: DONALD BRISLIN
Case Number: 2:2019cv03749
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOHN R PADOVA
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7604a
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA Show Cause Hearing held on 10/2/2019. Court Reporter: ESR. (sg, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (LINDGREN, ERIN)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re: Revenue Officer Patricia Reuter served Summons and Complaint upon DONALD BRISLIN by Hand Delivery. DONALD BRISLIN served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (LINDGREN, ERIN)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDERED THAT DONALD BRISLIN SHALL APPEAR BEFORE THE USDC FOR THE EDPA BEFORE THE HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA IN COURTROOM 17B ON 10/2/2019 AT 11:00 AM TO SHOW CAUSE WHY AN ORDER SHOULD NOT BE ENTERED ENFORCING THE INTERNAL REVENUE SUMMONS SERVED ON HIM ON 3/5/2019. ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 8/26/2019. 8/27/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Enforce Internal Revenue Summons against DONALD BRISLIN, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (No fee required) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet/Designation Form/Track Form)(fdc) Modified on 8/22/2019 (lisad, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BRISLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD BRISLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: GREGORY B. DAVID
Represented By: ERIN E. LINDGREN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?