THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA v. GEE et al
Plaintiff: THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Defendant: SHALIKA GEE, RICHARD BATTLE, LATORIA GEE, TABITHA GEE, ROBERT GEE, MAALIKA GEE, C&J FINANCIAL, LLC, CAMERON BATTLE and SHEILA GEE
Case Number: 2:2019cv03763
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MITCHELL S GOLDBERG
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 REGENERATED NEF FOR ORDER #41 TO PRO SE SHALIKA GEE (jpd, )
September 17, 2020 COPY OF #55 PDF REGENERATED TO PRO SE PARTIES (jpd, )
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED THAT THOMAS E. REILLY, ESQUIRE SHALL BE, AND IS HEREBY, GRANTED LEAVE TO WITHDRAW HIS APPEARANCE IN THE ABOVE MATTER AND THE COURT SHALL MARKET THE DOCKET THAT HIS APPEARANCE HAS BEEN, BY THIS ORDER, WITHDRAWN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 9/16/20.9/16/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO PRO SE'S.(jaa, )
September 16, 2020 Filing 54 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Purusant to Local Rule of Civil Procedure 5.1(c) for C&J Financial, LLC a/k/a FFC Acquisition Co., LLC filed by C&J FINANCIAL, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(REILLY, THOMAS)
September 8, 2020 DISCOVERY DUE BY 9/25/2020. (amas, )
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER THAT PARAGRAPH ONE OF THE 8/27/20 ORDER (RE: DOC. NO. #50 ) IS AMEDED. THE MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (DOC. NO. #42 ) IS GRANTED IN PART. THE DEADLINE FOR ALL FACT DISCOVERY IS EXTENDED TO 9/25/20. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 9/8/20. 9/8/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SES; E-MAILED.(amas, )
September 8, 2020 Filing 52 PRO SE DEFENDANT'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME FOR FACT DISCOVERY, filed by LATORIA GEE, MAALIKA GEE, ROBERT GEE, SHALIKA GEE. NO ENVELOPE.(sg, )
September 8, 2020 Filing 51 Letter dated 9/4/20 from TIFFANY THORNTON TO JUDGE GOLDBERG RE: CERTAIN STATEMENTS; ETC. (JL )
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDERED AS FOLLOWS THAT THE MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (DOC. NO. 42) IS GRANTED IN PART. THE DEADLINE FOR FACT DISCOVERY IS EXTENDED TO SEPTEMBER 25, 2020 FOR THE SOLE PURPOSE OF COMPLETING THE GEE DEFENDANTS DEPOSITIONS.ALL OTHER DEADLINES SET FORTH IN THE JULY 16, 2020 ORDER (DOC. NO. 41) ARE EXTENDED BY A PERIOD OF THIRTY (30) DAYS.NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS OF DEADLINES IN THIS CASE SHALL BE GRANTED.THE GEE DEFENDANTS SHALL APPEAR FOR A DEPOSITION PRIOR TO SEPTEMBER 25, 2020. COUNSEL FOR THE BATTLE DEFENDANTS IS DIRECTED TO CONFER IN GOOD FAITH WITH THE GEE DEFENDANTS TO SCHEDULE THE DEPOSITIONS AT A CONVENIENT TIME AND PLACE AND TO GIVE THE GEE DEFENDANTS SUFFICIENT TIMETO COORDINATE THEIR AVAILABILITY. THE BATTLE DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS (DOC. NO. 47) IS DENIED.THE TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR TUESDAY, SEPTEMBER 1, 2020 IS CANCELLED.SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 8/27/20.8/27/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, ) (Main Document 50 replaced on 9/1/2020) (jaa, ).
August 26, 2020 Filing 49 PRO SE' DEFENDANT'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS filed by LATORIA GEE, MAALIKA GEE, ROBERT GEE, SHALIKA GEE. (jaa, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 48 CERTIFICATE of Good Faith re #47 First MOTION to Compel by RONALD J. HARPER on behalf of RICHARD BATTLE, CAMERON BATTLE, SHEILA GEE, TABITHA GEE(HARPER, RONALD) Modified on 8/25/2020 (tjd).
August 24, 2020 Filing 47 First MOTION to Compel Depositions filed by RICHARD BATTLE, CAMERON BATTLE, SHEILA GEE, TABITHA GEE. Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(HARPER, RONALD) Modified on 8/25/2020 (tjd).
August 24, 2020 Filing 46 REVISED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #42 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery : TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/1/2020 AT 10:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG. COUNSEL AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES SHOULD DIAL IN AS DIRECTED IN THE NOTICE. (sl, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #42 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery : TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/1/2020 AT 10:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG. COUNSEL SHOULD DIAL IN AS DIRECTED IN THE NOTICE. (sl, )
August 21, 2020 Filing 44 REPLY to Response to Motion re #42 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by RICHARD BATTLE, CAMERON BATTLE, SHEILA GEE, TABITHA GEE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & B, #2 Certificate of Service)(HARPER, RONALD)
August 20, 2020 Filing 43 PRO SE' DEFENDANT'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME filed by LATORIA GEE, MAALIKA GEE, ROBERT GEE, SHALIKA GEE. (jaa, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 42 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by RICHARD BATTLE, CAMERON BATTLE, SHEILA GEE, TABITHA GEE.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(HARPER, RONALD) Modified on 8/20/2020 (nd, ).
July 20, 2020 Document #41 mailed to all pro se parties. (kw, )
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDERED THE DISCOVERY DEADLINES SET FORTH IN THE FEBRUARY 7, 2020SCHEDULING ORDER (DOC. NO. 31) AS AMENDED BY THE JUNE 30, 2020 ORDER (DOC. NO. 39), ARE FURTHER AMENDED AS FOLLOWS AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 7/16/20. 7/16/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO PRO SES. (jaa, ) Modified on 7/16/2020 (jaa, ).
July 16, 2020 Filing 40 Letter dated 7/14/20 by Ronald J. Harper. (jaa, )
July 7, 2020 MAILED OUT COPY ORDER ENTRIES #35 AND 39 ON 7/7/20. (jaa, )
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER THAT THE DISCOVERY DEADLINES SET FORTH IN THE 2/7/20 SCHEDULING ORDER ARE AMENDED. ALL FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 8/25/20. WITHIN 14 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, THE BATTLE DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE A LETTER INDICATING WHETHER THEY PLAN TO PURSUE EXPERT DISCOVERY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 6/30/20. 6/30/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SES; E-MAILED.(amas, )
June 30, 2020 Filing 38 Letter to the Honorable Mitchell S. Goldberg from LATORIA GEE, MAALIKA GEE, ROBERT GEE, SHALIKA GEE re: DISCOVERY FINDINGS *NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (rf, )
June 30, 2020 Filing 37 PRO SE DEFENDANTS MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME, filed by LATORIA GEE, MAALIKA GEE, ROBERT GEE, SHALIKA GEE. (sg, )
June 25, 2020 Filing 36 Letter dated 6/25/20 by Ronald J. Harper, Esquire. (jaa, )
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDERED THAT WITHIN SEVEN (7) DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, THE PARTIES SHALL EACH SUBMIT A LETTER OF NO MORE THAN TWO (2) PAGES SETTING FORTH (1) PRECISELY WHAT DISCOVERY HAS BEEN COMPLETED AND WHAT DISCOVERY REMAINS TO BE COMPLETED, AND (2) WHETHER THE PARTIES INTEND TO CONDUCT EXPERT DISCOVERY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 6/24/20. 6/24/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO PRO SE'S. (jaa, )
June 23, 2020 Filing 34 PRO SE' DEFENDANTS' MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME, FILED BY LATORIA GEE, MAALIKA GEE, ROBERT GEE, SHALIKA GEE. (amas, )
June 23, 2020 Filing 33 LETTER TO JUDGE GOLDBERG; FROM RONALD J. HARPER; DATED 6/19/20; RE: EXTENSION OF TIME. (amas, )
February 18, 2020 The sum of $ 277,956.06 deposited into the Registry of the Court by Prudential Insurance. (jaa, )
February 12, 2020 Filing 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG RULE 16 Conference held on 2/6/20. Court Reporter: ESR. (jl, )
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDERED THAT THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE FOR SETTLEMENT PURPOSES; DISCOVERY DUE BY 10/9/2020. MOTIONS DUE BY 11/10/2020. ALL FURTHER DEADLINES WILL BE SET PENDING THE OUTCOME OF DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 2/7/20. 2/10/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE'S AND E-MAILED.(jaa, )
February 7, 2020 Filing 30 CONSENT ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 2/7/20. 2/10/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE'S AND E-MAILED.(jaa, )
February 5, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by TIFFANY THORNTON on behalf of RICHARD BATTLE, RICHARD BATTLE, CAMERON BATTLE, CAMERON BATTLE, SHEILA GEE, TABITHA GEE (jaa, )
January 24, 2020 Filing 28 Joint Report and Proposed Discovery Plan by THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA.(MALYK, JACLYN) Modified on 1/28/2020 (tjd).
January 8, 2020 Filing 27 ANSWER to #24 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, FILED BY LATORIA GEE, MAALIKA GEE, ROBERT GEE, SHALIKA GEE.(amas)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDERED THAT A RULE 16 CONFERENCE IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER IS SCHEDULED FOR THURSDAY, FEBRUARY 6, 2020 AT 10:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 4B. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 1/6/20. 1/8/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE'S AND E-MAILED.(jaa, )
December 24, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER to #16 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, C &J Financial by RICHARD BATTLE, CAMERON BATTLE, SHEILA GEE, TABITHA GEE. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(HARPER, RONALD)
December 24, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, , CROSSCLAIM against LATORIA GEE, MAALIKA GEE, ROBERT GEE, SHALIKA GEE by CAMERON BATTLE, RICHARD BATTLE. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(HARPER, RONALD) Modified on 1/2/2020 (tjd).
December 23, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA re: Guaranteed Subpoena served Summons and Complaint upon CAMERON BATTLE by Personal Service. CAMERON BATTLE served on 12/3/2019, answer due 12/24/2019. (MALYK, JACLYN)
December 23, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA re: Guaranteed Subpoena served Summons and Complaint upon RICHARD BATTLE by Leaving a copy of papers with Defendant's Brother. RICHARD BATTLE served on 12/3/2019, answer due 12/24/2019. (MALYK, JACLYN)
December 4, 2019 Filing 21 DEFENDANTS LATORIA GEE, MAALIKA GEE, SHALIKA GEE, AND ROBERT GEE'S ANSWER, AND CROSS CLAIMS ANSWER TO INTERPLEADER WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by LATORIA GEE, MAALIKA GEE, ROBERT GEE, SHALIKA GEE.(jaa, ) *NO ENVELOPE PROVIDED.
November 22, 2019 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. MAALIKA GEE waiver sent on 10/25/2019, answer due 12/24/2019. (MALYK, JACLYN)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO EXTEND THE DEADLINE TO SERVE DEFENDANTS, RICHARD BATTLE AND CAMERON BATTLE PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P. 4(M) FOR AN ADDITIONAL SIXTY (60) DAYS IS GRANTED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 11/14/19.11/15/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(jaa, )
November 14, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Service Extension Pursuant to Rule 4(m) filed by THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA.Brief, Delaration of Joyce S. Min, Esq.,, Certification of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Joyce S. Min, Esq., #3 Exhibit A to Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to Declaration, #6 Exhibit D to Declaration, #7 Proposed Order, #8 Certification of Service)(MALYK, JACLYN)
November 8, 2019 Filing 17 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including SNFC Subsidiary LLC which is the wholly owned subsidiary of Security National Financial Corporation with Certificate of Service by C&J FINANCIAL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(REILLY, THOMAS)
November 8, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, , CROSSCLAIM against RICHARD BATTLE, CAMERON BATTLE, LATORIA GEE, MAALIKA GEE, ROBERT GEE, SHALIKA GEE, SHEILA GEE, TABITHA GEE by C&J FINANCIAL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(REILLY, THOMAS)
November 1, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. ROBERT GEE waiver sent on 10/29/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (MALYK, JACLYN)
October 25, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. SHALIKA GEE waiver sent on 10/15/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (MALYK, JACLYN)
October 15, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. LATORIA GEE waiver sent on 10/10/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (MALYK, JACLYN)
October 9, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, and, CROSSCLAIM against LATORIA GEE, MAALIKA GEE, ROBERT GEE, SHALIKA GEE by SHEILA GEE, TABITHA GEE. Affirmative Defenses. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(HARPER, RONALD) Modified on 10/10/2019 (tjd).
August 27, 2019 Filing 11 12(b) PROCEDURAL ORDER (sl, )
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. C&J FINANCIAL, LLC waiver sent on 8/27/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (MALYK, JACLYN)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 1:19-cv-16494. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 20, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (rss, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/22/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TRANSFERRING THE CASE TO THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 8/20/2019. (rss, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/22/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Service)(MALYK, JACLYN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/22/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. SHEILA GEE waiver sent on 8/15/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (MALYK, JACLYN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/22/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. TABITHA GEE waiver sent on 8/15/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (MALYK, JACLYN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/22/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE within 10 days of the date of this Order, as to why this case should not be transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 8/13/2019. (rss, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/22/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to RICHARD BATTLE, CAMERON BATTLE, C&J FINANCIAL, LLC, LATORIA GEE, MAALIKA GEE, ROBERT GEE, SHALIKA GEE, SHEILA GEE, TABITHA GEE. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/22/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (cry, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/22/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/22/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. (MALYK, JACLYN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/22/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RICHARD BATTLE, CAMERON BATTLE, C&J FINANCIAL, LLC, LATORIA GEE, MAALIKA GEE, ROBERT GEE, SHALIKA GEE, SHEILA GEE, TABITHA GEE ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9880093), filed by THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B through M, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons for Latoria Gee, #5 Summons for Sheila Gee, #6 Summons for Maalika Gee, #7 Summons for Tabitha Gee, #8 Summons for Shalika Gee, #9 Summons for Robert Gee, #10 Summons for Richard Battle, #11 Summons for Cameron Battle, #12 Summons for C&J Financial, LLC)(MALYK, JACLYN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/22/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA v. GEE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHALIKA GEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD BATTLE
Represented By: RONALD J. HARPER
Represented By: TIFFANY THORNTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LATORIA GEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TABITHA GEE
Represented By: RONALD J. HARPER
Represented By: TIFFANY THORNTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT GEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAALIKA GEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C&J FINANCIAL, LLC
Represented By: THOMAS EUGENE REILLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMERON BATTLE
Represented By: RONALD J. HARPER
Represented By: TIFFANY THORNTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHEILA GEE
Represented By: RONALD J. HARPER
Represented By: TIFFANY THORNTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By: JACLYN DILASCIO MALYK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?