THE ESTATE OF ARTHUR PHILLIPS et al v. CORIZON HEALTH, INC. et al
Plaintiff: THE ESTATE OF ARTHUR PHILLIPS and PHYLLIS PHILLIPS
Defendant: DR. JOHN DOE, CORIZON HEALTH, INC., HANNAH JENKINS, BARBARA HERST, MHM CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC. and INGENESIS, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv03822
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: HARVEY BARTLE
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION DISMISSING CORIZON HEALTH, INC. WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 10/15/19. 10/15/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED. (va, )
October 10, 2019 4 Summons Issued as to BARBARA HERST, INGENESIS, INC., HANNAH JENKINS, MHM CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC.. Forwarded To: PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 10/15/2019 (amas)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT, WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE against JOHN DOE, BARBARA HERST, INGENESIS, INC., HANNAH JENKINS, MHM CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC., filed by PHYLLIS PHILLIPS, THE ESTATE OF ARTHUR PHILLIPS.(amas)
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Corizon Health, Inc. by PHYLLIS PHILLIPS, THE ESTATE OF ARTHUR PHILLIPS. (DAVIS, WILLIAM) Modified on 10/4/2019 (md).
August 23, 2019 Four (4) Summons Issued as to CORIZON HEALTH, INC., BARBARA HERST, HANNAH JENKINS, MHM CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC.. Forwarded To: William M. Davis on 8/23/19. (fdc)
August 23, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by PHYLLIS PHILLIPS, THE ESTATE OF ARTHUR PHILLIPS. (fdc, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CORIZON HEALTH, INC., JOHN DOE, BARBARA HERST, HANNAH JENKINS, MHM CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 202493.), filed by THE ESTATE OF ARTHUR PHILLIPS, PHYLLIS PHILLIPS.(fdc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THE ESTATE OF ARTHUR PHILLIPS et al v. CORIZON HEALTH, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE ESTATE OF ARTHUR PHILLIPS
Represented By: WILLIAM M. DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHYLLIS PHILLIPS
Represented By: WILLIAM M. DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORIZON HEALTH, INC.
Represented By: THOMAS J. GREGORY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HANNAH JENKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARBARA HERST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MHM CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INGENESIS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?