GRAHAM v. CONNORS
Plaintiff: FREDERICK GRAHAM
Defendant: IAN CONNORS
Case Number: 2:2019cv03919
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CYNTHIA M RUFE
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Original Motion (#5) and Original Supplemental Motion (#7) forwarded to the USDC for the Middle District of PA, per order dated 9/11/2019 and chambers instructions, along with certified copies of the orders and the docket entries, by Certified Mail on 9/16/2019.(md)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FILED BY FREDERICK GRAHAM. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (mas, )
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED THAT THE CLERK SHALL FORWARD PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY INJUNCTION TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. THE MOTIONS SHALL BE LFT TO THE DISCRETION OF THE TRANSFEREE COURT. PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE ANY FURTHER MOTIONS WITH THE TRANSFEREE COURT, THE U.S.D.C. FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 9/11/2019. 9/11/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(sg, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION OF PRO SE PLAINTIFF FREDERICK GRAHAM FOR TEMPORARY INJUNCTION, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (DT) (ENVELOPE ATTACHED)
September 6, 2019 LETTER TO PRO SE PLAINTFF RE: TRANSFER OF THE ABOVE CAPTIONED MATTER. (jpd)
September 6, 2019 Original record transferred to the Middle District of Pennsylvania via interdistrict transfer system.(lisad, )
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL TRANSFER FORTHWITH THE ABOVE CAPTIONED MATTER TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION SHALL BE LEFT TO THE DISCRETION OF THE TRANSFEREE COURT.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 9/3/19. 9/5/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF.(jpd, ) Modified on 9/6/2019 (lisad, ).
August 29, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by FREDERICK GRAHAM. (lisad, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (amas)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, FILED BY FREDERICK GRAHAM.(amas)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against IAN CONNORS, filed by FREDERICK GRAHAM.NO FEE PAID, NO IFP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 ENVELOPE)(amas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/29/2019: #3 Designation Form , CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK FORM) (amas, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRAHAM v. CONNORS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FREDERICK GRAHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IAN CONNORS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?