RUSSO v. TRANS UNION, LLC et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL RUSSO
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., CAPITAL ONE, N.A., TRANS UNION, LLC, DISCOVER FINANCIAL SERVICES, BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE and EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv04007
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GENE EK PRATTER
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 34 ANSWER to Complaint together with and Affirmative Defenses by BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CROFT, BLAEC)
October 30, 2019 Filing 33 ANSWER to Complaint together with affirmative defenses, certificate of service by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC..(GHIASUDDIN, MOHAMMAD)
October 15, 2019 Filing 32 ANSWER to Complaint together with Defenses by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC.(KLEIN, JONATHAN)
October 14, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by SADE C. CALIN on behalf of DISCOVER FINANCIAL SERVICES with Certificate of Service(CALIN, SADE)
October 8, 2019 Filing 30 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Discover Financial Services with Certificate of Service by DISCOVER FINANCIAL SERVICES.(MCKENNA, DANIEL)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. MUST ANSWER, PLEAD, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE NOVEMBER 1, 2019. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 10/3/2019. 10/3/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 28 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Bank of America Corporation with Certificate of Service by BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CROFT, BLAEC)
October 2, 2019 Filing 27 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint (Attorney), extension of time to respond to complaint by BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service). (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL). (CROFT, BLAEC) Modified on 10/3/2019 (fb).
October 1, 2019 Filing 26 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SUBSTITUTE PROPER DEFENDANT. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 10/1/2019. 10/1/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, )
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES MUST ANSWER, PLEAD, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 10/15/2019. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 9/30/2019. 10/1/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint by DISCOVER FINANCIAL SERVICES. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MCKENNA, DANIEL)
September 30, 2019 Filing 23 Joint Stipulation to Substitute Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. as Defendant for Capital One, N.A. by CAPITAL ONE, N.A.. (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL). (SIMONS, ADAM) Modified on 10/1/2019 (fb).
September 30, 2019 Filing 22 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Capital One Financial Corporation with Certificate of Service by CAPITAL ONE, N.A..(SIMONS, ADAM)
September 30, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint by CAPITAL ONE, N.A..(SIMONS, ADAM)
September 30, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint And Affirmative Defenses by TRANS UNION, LLC.(NICODEMUS, CAMILLE)
September 27, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint (Attorney), - Extension of Time to Answer by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC.. (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL). (KLEIN, JONATHAN) Modified on 9/30/2019 (fb).
September 27, 2019 Filing 18 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Equifax Inc. by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC.(KLEIN, JONATHAN)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER. DEFENDANT EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. MUST ANSWER PLEAD, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE OCTOBER 30, 2019. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 9/23/2019. 9/24/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Experian plc with Certificate of Service by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC..(GHIASUDDIN, MOHAMMAD)
September 19, 2019 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Barclays Group US Inc., Barclays US LLC, Barclays Bank, PLC, Barclays, PLC with Certificate of Service by BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE.(WEIKEL, JAMES)
September 19, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing: AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 1/7/2020 AT 2:00 PM IN CHAMBERS (RM. 10613) BEFORE THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement)(sfl, )
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDERED THAT THE APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ON BEHALF OF CAMILLE R. NICODEMUS FOR DEFENDANT TRANS UNION LLC IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 9/17/19. 9/18/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rab, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE.(WEIKEL, JAMES)
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 Amended APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Missing document added to Doc. No. 7- Fee Previously Paid) of Camille R. Nicodemus, Esquire by TRANS UNION, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(GREEN, CASEY) Modified on 9/17/2019 (fb).
September 13, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MICHAEL RUSSO re: D'Wayne Henriksson served Summons and Complaint upon TRANS UNION, LLC by personal service. TRANS UNION, LLC served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (VULLINGS, BRENT)
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MICHAEL RUSSO re: Ryan Flaska served Summons and Complaint upon EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. by personal service. EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. served on 9/10/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. (VULLINGS, BRENT)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. and TransUnion with Certificate of Service by TRANS UNION, LLC.(GREEN, CASEY)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Camille R. Nicodemus, Esquire by TRANS UNION, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13793584.). (GREEN, CASEY)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MICHAEL RUSSO re: Michael R. Meyer served Summons and Complaint upon BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION by personal service. BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION served on 9/11/2019, answer due 10/2/2019. (VULLINGS, BRENT)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MICHAEL RUSSO re: William Cooper served Summons and Complaint upon BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE by personal service. BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (VULLINGS, BRENT)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MICHAEL RUSSO re: Rhianna Hoffer served Summons and Complaint upon DISCOVER FINANCIAL SERVICES by personal service. DISCOVER FINANCIAL SERVICES served on 9/10/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. (VULLINGS, BRENT)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MICHAEL RUSSO re: Christopher Horton served Summons and Complaint upon EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC by personal service. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (VULLINGS, BRENT)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MICHAEL RUSSO re: Adam Robins served Summons and Complaint upon CAPITAL ONE, N.A. by personal service. CAPITAL ONE, N.A. served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (VULLINGS, BRENT)
September 3, 2019 7 Original Summons Issued as to BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION, BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE, CAPITAL ONE, N.A., DISCOVER FINANCIAL SERVICES, EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., TRANS UNION, LLC forwarded to Plaintiff's Counsel on 9/3/19. (rf, )
September 3, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by MICHAEL RUSSO. (rf, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION, BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE, CAPITAL ONE, N.A., DISCOVER FINANCIAL SERVICES, EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., TRANS UNION, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-13771137.), filed by MICHAEL RUSSO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(VULLINGS, BRENT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RUSSO v. TRANS UNION, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION
Represented By: BLAEC C. CROFT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.
Represented By: MOHAMMAD A. GHIASUDDIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPITAL ONE, N.A.
Represented By: ADAM T. SIMONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANS UNION, LLC
Represented By: CASEY GREEN
Represented By: CAMILLE R. NICODEMUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISCOVER FINANCIAL SERVICES
Represented By: SADE C. CALIN
Represented By: DANIEL J.T. MCKENNA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE
Represented By: JAMES THOMAS WEIKEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: JONATHAN D. KLEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL RUSSO
Represented By: BRENT F. VULLINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?