HOOPER v. PRENLYN ENTERPRISES, INC.
Plaintiff: GRAHAM HOOPER
Defendant: PRENLYN ENTERPRISES, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv04036
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: C DARNELL JONES
Referring Judge: JOHN M YOUNGE
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13898164.) filed by GRAHAM HOOPER.Cert of Service; Proposed Order.(DENITTIS, STEPHEN)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT A FRCP 16 CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 11/14/2019 AT 2:00 PM IN CHAMBERS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 10/30/19. 10/31/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by PRENLYN ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Certificate of Service)(UPIN, JOSHUA)
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 Entry of Appearance of Joshua Upin by PRENLYN ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(UPIN, JOSHUA) Modified on 10/30/2019 (fb).
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THE UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR AN ENLARGEMENT OF TIME OF PRENLYN ENTERPRISES, INC. IS GRANTED. THE TIME TO ANSWER THE COMPLAINT IS NOW EXTENDED UNTIL 10/29/19. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 10/10/19. 10/11/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by PRENLYN ENTERPRISES, INC., PRENLYN ENTERPRISES, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(COHEN, BARRY)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by BARRY L. COHEN on behalf of PRENLYN ENTERPRISES, INC., PRENLYN ENTERPRISES, INC. with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(COHEN, BARRY)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GRAHAM HOOPER served Summons and Complaint upon PRENLYN ENTERPRISES, INC.. PRENLYN ENTERPRISES, INC. served on 9/24/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (DENITTIS, STEPHEN)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 9/30/19. 9/30/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
September 4, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by GRAHAM HOOPER. (ahf)
September 4, 2019 Summons Issued as to PRENLYN ENTERPRISES, INC. 1 Forwarded To: Counsel on 9/5/2019 (ahf)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PRENLYN ENTERPRISES, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 203150.), filed by GRAHAM HOOPER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheets)(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOOPER v. PRENLYN ENTERPRISES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRENLYN ENTERPRISES, INC.
Represented By: JOSHUA UPIN
Represented By: BARRY L. COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRAHAM HOOPER
Represented By: STEPHEN P. DENITTIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?