DA SILVA v. TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC. et al
Plaintiff: JOSHUA DA SILVA
Defendant: TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC., MICAELA FERNANDES, TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL DEPARTMENT OF OBSTETRICS, GYNECOLOGY, SAMANTHA JAGANNATHAN, CLINTON TURNER, TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL and SARAH MARTIN
Case Number: 2:2019cv04111
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE #3 IS GRANTED. THE CASE SHALL BE MARKED CLOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/24/2019. 10/25/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nds)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA COUNTY. (rf, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by JOSHUA DA SILVA.Memorandum,Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MESSA, JOSEPH)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Substitute and Dismiss filed by CLINTON TURNER. Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A.pdf, #2 Exhibit B.pdf)(CHERICO, COLIN) Modified on 9/17/2019 (md).
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CLINTON TURNER from PHILADELPHIA COUNTY COURT OF COMMON PLEAS, case number 190501803. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(dmc, ) Modified on 9/10/2019 (dmc, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DA SILVA v. TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICAELA FERNANDES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL DEPARTMENT OF OBSTETRICS, GYNECOLOGY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMANTHA JAGANNATHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLINTON TURNER
Represented By: GREGORY B. DAVID
Represented By: COLIN M. CHERICO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEMPLE UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SARAH MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA DA SILVA
Represented By: JOSEPH L. MESSA, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?