GENERAL STAR INDEMNITY COMPANY v. JOSHUA COHEN DESIGN, LLC
Plaintiff: GENERAL STAR INDEMNITY COMPANY
Defendant: JOSHUA COHEN DESIGN, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv04140
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by JOSHUA COHEN DESIGN, LLC.(WALTO, CATHERINE)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING THE DEFENDANT AN EXTENSION OF TIME UNTIL NOVEMBER 6, 2019 IN WHICH TO FILE AN ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 11/4/2019. 11/4/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nds)
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by CATHERINE N. WALTO on behalf of JOSHUA COHEN DESIGN, LLC with 10/24/2019(WALTO, CATHERINE)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN H. MCCARTHY on behalf of JOSHUA COHEN DESIGN, LLC with 10/24/2019(MCCARTHY, JOHN)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY, INC., Corporate Parent GENERAL REINSURANCE CORPORATION for GENERAL STAR INDEMNITY COMPANY. by GENERAL STAR INDEMNITY COMPANY.(ahf)
September 10, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by GENERAL STAR INDEMNITY COMPANY. (ahf)
September 10, 2019 Summons Issued as to JOSHUA COHEN DESIGN, LLC. 1 Forwarded To: Counsel on 9/11/2019 (ahf)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOSHUA COHEN DESIGN, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 203437.), filed by GENERAL STAR INDEMNITY COMPANY.(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GENERAL STAR INDEMNITY COMPANY v. JOSHUA COHEN DESIGN, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GENERAL STAR INDEMNITY COMPANY
Represented By: PETER G. ROSSI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSHUA COHEN DESIGN, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?