ADAIKKAPPAN v. LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Plaintiff: VIJAY MURUGESH ADAIKKAPPAN
Defendant: LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Case Number: 2:2019cv04265
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JUAN R SANCHEZ
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE LINDA K. CARACAPPA FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, ETC. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 11/13/19. 11/15/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ARE DUE NO LATER THAN 2/24/2020. REPLIES ARE DUE NO LATER THAN 3/9/2020. ORAL ARGUMENT WILL BE HELD 3/23/2020 AT 9:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 14B, ETC. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 11/14/19. 11/15/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZin Courtroom 14B Pretrial Conference held on 11/4/2019 (amas)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT A RULE 16 CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER ON 11/4/2019 AT 2:30 P.M. IN COURTROOM 14B, ETC. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 10/24/19. 10/25/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by ALBERT FRANCIS MORAN on behalf of LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA with Certificate of Service(MORAN, ALBERT)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Cigna Corporation with Certificate of Service by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA.(KLINE, AMY)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA.(KLINE, AMY)
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by AMY S. KLINE on behalf of LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA with Certificate of Service(KLINE, AMY)
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Tim Porvaznik re: served Summons & Complaint upon Cheryl Chatburn by Hand Delivery on 09/25/2019, answer due 10/16/2019. (MCLEAN, DANIEL) Modified on 10/2/2019 (tjd).
September 17, 2019 1 Summons Issued as to LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA. GIVEN TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 9/17/2019 (amas)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 203745.), filed by VIJAY MURUGESH ADAIKKAPPAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, DESIGNATION FORM, CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK FORM)(amas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ADAIKKAPPAN v. LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIJAY MURUGESH ADAIKKAPPAN
Represented By: DANIEL M. MCLEAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?