DUBE v. THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA et al
Plaintiff: JAMES E. DUBE
Defendant: THE SCHOOL DISTRICT OF PHILADELPHIA LAW DEPARTMENT, JOE TORSELLA, GOVERNOR TOM WOLFE, PHFA HOSING FINANCE AGENCY (BENEFICIARIES), KATHY BOOCKVAR, THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, MAYOR JAMES KENNY and ROB DEBOW
Case Number: 2:2019cv04276
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: TIMOTHY J SAVAGE
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF REQUEST TO PROCEED WITHOUT PAYING FEES IS DISMISSED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 11/14/19.11/15/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(mbh, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF REQUEST TO PROCEED WITHOUT PAYING FEES FILED BY JAMES E. DUBE.(mbh, )
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR EMERGENCY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 11/6/19. 11/7/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(mbh, )
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. PLAINTIFF IS GRANTED LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SEND PLAINTIFF A COPY OF THIS COURT'S FORM COMPLAINT TO BE USED BY A PRO SE INDIVIDUAL FILING A CIVIL ACTION, WHICH PLAINTIFF MAY USE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT. IF PLAINTIFF FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER, HIS CASE WILL BE DISMISSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 11/6/19. 11/7/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE (WITH FORM)(mbh, )
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 11/6/19. 11/7/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PARTY.(mbh, )
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS FILED BY JAMES E. DUBE.(mbh, )
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (DOCUMENT NO. #1 ) IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SEND MR. DUBE AN APPROPRIATE NON-PRISONER APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, BEARING THE CIVIL ACTION NUBMER OF THIS CASE; IF MR. DUBE SEEKS TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, HE SHALL WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER COMPLETE THE FORM; THE COURT CANNOT ADDRESS THE COMPLAINT OR THE PENDING MOTION; IF MR. DUBE FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER, HIS CASE WILL BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 09/17/2019.09/17/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED-.(nd, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (ahf)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION FOR EMERGENCY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF FILED BY JAMES E. DUBE.(ahf)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against KATHY BOOCKVAR, ROB DEBOW, JAMES KENNY, PHFA HOSING FINANCE AGENCY (BENEFICIARIES), THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, THE SCHOOL DISTRICT OF PHILADELPHIA LAW DEPARTMENT, JOE TORSELLA, TOM WOLFE, filed by JAMES E. DUBE. (NO ENVELOPE INCLUDED).(ahf)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS FILED BY JAMES E. DUBE.(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DUBE v. THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE SCHOOL DISTRICT OF PHILADELPHIA LAW DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOE TORSELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOVERNOR TOM WOLFE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHFA HOSING FINANCE AGENCY (BENEFICIARIES)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHY BOOCKVAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAYOR JAMES KENNY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROB DEBOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES E. DUBE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?