ALI v. CLARK et al
Petitioner: JAMAL ALI
Respondent: DISTRICT ATTORNEY COUNTY OF PHILADELPHIA, MICHAEL CLARK and ATTORNEY GENERAL STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA
Case Number: 2:2019cv04339
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOSEPH F LEESON
Referring Judge: HENRY S PERKIN
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Copies of Docket Sheet, Order and Petition for Habeas Corpus Sent to The Attorney General and Superintendant by Certified Mail. (DT) (DT)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF 10/2/2019 THAT THE PROTHONOTARY OF PHILADELPHIA/CLERK OF COURTS FOR THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, SHALL FILE WITH THE CLERK OF THIS COURT WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, COPIES OF ALL RECORDS, INCLUDING TRANSCRIPTS OF NOTES OF TESTIMONY AT ARRAIGNMENT, PRE-TRIAL AND SUPPRESSION HEARINGS, TRIAL, POST-TRIAL AND POST-CONVICTION HEARINGS AND APPEALS; ALL TRIAL, APPELLATE AND POST-CONVICTION BRIEFS AND PETITIONS; ALL PLEADINGS; AND ALL COURT OPINIONS OF PROCEEDINGS IN THE MATTER OF COMMONWEALTH V. JAMAL ALI, COURT OF COMMON PLEAS PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, NO. CP-51-CR-0000070-2010. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: HENRY S. PERKIN ON 10/2/2019. 10/2/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND COPIES SENT BY CERTIFIED MAIL ATTORNEY GENERAL, DISTRICT ATTORNEY AND SUPERINTENDANT. (DT)
October 2, 2019 COPIES OF PETITION, DOCKET SHEET AND ORDER E-MAILED TO THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF PHILADELPHIA COUNTY. (DT)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF 10/2/2019 THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, IT IS ORDERED THAT THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY FOR THE COUNTY OF PHILADELPHIA IS ADDED AS A RESPONDENT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY FOR THE COUNTY OF PHILADLEPHIA SHALL FILE A RESONSE TO THE PETITION AND A BRIEF OR MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT THEREOF AND ATTACH COPIES OF THE PERTINENT RECORDS, STATE COURT ORDERS, MEMORANDA, AND DECISIONS THERETO WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, PURSUANT TO RULE 5, 28 U.S.C. 2254. SIGNED BY: MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN ON 10/2/2019. 10/2/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(DT)
September 26, 2019 Copy of Order, Docket Entries and Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, E-mailed to District Attorney of Philadelphia. (DT)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF 9/26/2019 THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS REFERRED TO THE HONORABLE HENRY S. PERKIN,U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, FOR A REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. ETC. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PROVIDE THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE OF PHILADELPHIA, WITH A COPY OF THE PETITION. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOSEPH F. LEESON JR ON 9/26/2019. 9/26/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SECTION 2254 WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number PPE203947.) filed by JAMAL ALI. (Attachments: #1 APPENDIX, #2 PETITION)(jaa, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALI v. CLARK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DISTRICT ATTORNEY COUNTY OF PHILADELPHIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MICHAEL CLARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ATTORNEY GENERAL STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JAMAL ALI
Represented By: DANIEL ALAN SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?