CHEEZE v. SAUL
Plaintiff: CALVIN LA-VERNCE CHEEZE, III
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv04341
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 Social Security Magistrate Consent by CALVIN LA-VERNCE CHEEZE, III.. (GORNSTEIN, SHARON)
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (rf, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDDER.SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 11/19/18.9/26/19 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED. (rf, )
September 25, 2019 3 Original Summons Issued as to ANDREW SAUL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. 2 Summons forwarded to the US Marshal Service on 9/25/19. 1 Summons to the US Attorney on 9/25/19. (rf, )
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ISSUE SUMMONSES. THE UNITED STATES MARSHAL FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA SHALL SERVE THE SUMMOSNES AND THE COMPLAINT IN ACCORDANCE WITH FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 4(I) AS OUTLINED HEREIN. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SERVE THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS ON 9/24/19. 9/26/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 CONSENT FORM)(bw, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION BY CALVIN LA-VERNCE CHEEZE, III. TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS..(bw, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREW SAUL, filed by CALVIN LA-VERNCE CHEEZE, III. (IFP PENDING).(bw, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/20/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHEEZE v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CALVIN LA-VERNCE CHEEZE, III
Represented By: SHARON GORNSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?