PARKER v. SCOTLANDYARD SECURITY SERVICES, INC. et al
Plaintiff: DEMETRIUS PARKER
Defendant: MR. DAWSON, HANIF JACKSON, SCOTLANDYARD SECURITY SERVICES, INC., DARLENE GREEN, LAUREL SHOVLIN, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, CAROLE, RESOURCES FOR HUMAN DEVELOPMENT, INC. and RIVERVIEW PERSONAL CARE HOME
Case Number: 2:2019cv04346
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: ANITA B BRODY
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DEMETRIUS PARKER. LAUREL SHOVLIN waiver sent on 9/23/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. (KEESLER, SUSAN) Modified on 11/7/2019 (fb).
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DEMETRIUS PARKER. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA waiver sent on 9/23/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. (KEESLER, SUSAN) Modified on 11/7/2019 (fb).
October 14, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DEMETRIUS PARKER. RESOURCES FOR HUMAN DEVELOPMENT, INC. waiver sent on 10/2/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (SMITH, CATHERINE) Modified on 10/15/2019 (fb).
October 14, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DEMETRIUS PARKER. HANIF JACKSON waiver sent on 10/2/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (SMITH, CATHERINE) Modified on 10/15/2019 (fb).
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN C. KEESLER on behalf of DEMETRIUS PARKER (KEESLER, SUSAN)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by RESOURCES FOR HUMAN DEVELOPMENT, INC..(BENNETT, JO)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by JO BENNETT on behalf of HANIF JACKSON, RESOURCES FOR HUMAN DEVELOPMENT, INC. (BENNETT, JO)
September 20, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by DEMETRIUS PARKER. (ahf)
September 20, 2019 Summons Issued as to CAROLE, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, DAWSON, DARLENE GREEN, HANIF JACKSON, RESOURCES FOR HUMAN DEVELOPMENT, INC., RIVERVIEW PERSONAL CARE HOME, SCOTLANDYARD SECURITY SERVICES, INC., LAUREL SHOVLIN. 10 Forwarded To: Counsel on 9/20/2019 (ahf)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CAROLE, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, DAWSON, DARLENE GREEN, HANIF JACKSON, RESOURCES FOR HUMAN DEVELOPMENT, INC., RIVERVIEW PERSONAL CARE HOME, SCOTLANDYARD SECURITY SERVICES, INC., LAUREL SHOVLIN ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 203952.), filed by DEMETRIUS PARKER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PARKER v. SCOTLANDYARD SECURITY SERVICES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MR. DAWSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HANIF JACKSON
Represented By: JO BENNETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTLANDYARD SECURITY SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DARLENE GREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAUREL SHOVLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAROLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RESOURCES FOR HUMAN DEVELOPMENT, INC.
Represented By: JO BENNETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RIVERVIEW PERSONAL CARE HOME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEMETRIUS PARKER
Represented By: CATHERINE W. SMITH
Represented By: SUSAN C. KEESLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?