PARK et al v. EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: BONG HO PARK and SANG KOO PARK
Defendant: EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY and MARKEL CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv04384
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MITCHELL S GOLDBERG
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER THAT WITHIN 10 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER THE PARTIES SHALL MEET AND CONFER REGARDING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, IF THE PARTIES STILL WISH TO FILE THEIR MOTIONS AFTER THEY MEET AND CONFER, THEY MUST DO SO WITHIN 21 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 11/13/19. 11/14/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG PRE MOTION Telephone Conference held on 11/12/19 (jl, )
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE by EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY, MARKEL CORPORATION re #13 Order, Set Hearings Letter Request to Judge Goldberg (BERNSTIEL, CYNTHIA)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Response In Opposition re #11 Notice (Other) Remand Letter to Judge Goldberg by EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY, MARKEL CORPORATION. (BERNSTIEL, CYNTHIA)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDERED THAT A PRE-MOTION CONFERENCE BY TELEPHONE IS SET FOR 11/12/2019 03:00 PM BEFORE HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 10/24/2019. 10/25/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE by BONG HO PARK, SANG KOO PARK re #10 Notice (Other), #9 Response Corrected Letter response to Defendant's letter dated October 18, 2019 (LEE, YUNG)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE by BONG HO PARK, SANG KOO PARK Remand Letter to Judge Goldberg (LEE, YUNG)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE by BONG HO PARK, SANG KOO PARK re #9 Response Letter response to Defendant's letter dated October 18, 2019 (LEE, YUNG)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Letter to Honorable Mitchell S. Goldberg by EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY, MARKEL CORPORATION. (BERNSTIEL, CYNTHIA) Modified on 10/21/2019 (lisad, ).
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE by BONG HO PARK, SANG KOO PARK re #5 Notice (Other) Letter response in opposition to defendants Request for Pre-Motion Conference (LEE, YUNG)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL, WITHIN THREE BUSINESS DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, SUBMIT A LETTER THAT RESPONDS TO THE ISSUES RASIED BY DEFENDANT AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 8/9/19. 8/9/19 ENTERED AND COPIES AND E-MAILED.(lisad, )
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 12(b) PROCEDURAL ORDER (sl, )
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE by EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY, MARKEL CORPORATION to request a Pre-Motion Conference (BERNSTIEL, CYNTHIA)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH JUDGE GOLDBERG'S RULE 12 (b)PROCEDUREAL ORDER; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 9/30/19.9/30/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY, MARKEL CORPORATION.Memorandum of Law, Certification of Counsel, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Affidavit of Cynthia Bernstiel, #3 Exhibit 1 to Affidavit of Cynthia Bernstiel, #4 Exhibit 2 to Affidavit of Cynthia Bernstiel, #5 Exhibit 3 to Affidavit of Cynthia Bernstiel, #6 Exhibit 4 to Affidavit of Cynthia Bernstiel, #7 Exhibit 5 to Affidavit of Cynthia Bernstiel, #8 Text of Proposed Order, #9 Certificate of Service)(BERNSTIEL, CYNTHIA)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent MARKEL CORPORATION for EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY. by EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY, MARKEL CORPORATION.(rf, ) Modified on 9/24/2019 (rf, ).
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY, MARKEL CORPORATION from COURT OF COMMON PLEAS PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, case number 190802273. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE204038), CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(rf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PARK et al v. EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: CYNTHIA L. BERNSTIEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARKEL CORPORATION
Represented By: CYNTHIA L. BERNSTIEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BONG HO PARK
Represented By: YUNG WAN LEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANG KOO PARK
Represented By: YUNG WAN LEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?