LASKOWSKI v. SAUL
Plaintiff: HENRY F. LASKOWSKI, III
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv04388
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MARILYN HEFFLEY
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 Social Security Magistrate Consent by HENRY F. LASKOWSKI, III.. (SILVER, JOSEPH)
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (amas)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 Social Security Standing Procedural Order 9/25/2019 Entered and copies e-mailed. (amas)
September 25, 2019 3 Summons Issued as to ANDREW M. SAUL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General Forwarded 2 COPIES TO THE US MARSHALS AND 1 TO CASE OPENING on 9/25/2019. (amas)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ISSUE SUMMONSES. THE US MARSHALS FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PA SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONSES AND COMPLAINT AT THE FOLLOWING ADDRESSES OUTLINED HEREIN. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SERVE THE US ATTORNEY FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PA. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY ON 9/25/2019.9/25/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 Consent)(ahf)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against ANDREW M. SAUL, filed by HENRY F. LASKOWSKI, III.(ahf)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERSIF FILED BY HENRY F. LASKOWSKI, III.(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LASKOWSKI v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HENRY F. LASKOWSKI, III
Represented By: JOSEPH B SILVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?