BOLDEN v. THE BOEING COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: TIMYKA BOLDEN
Defendant: BOEING COMMERCIAL AIRPLANES and THE BOEING COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv04453
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: PETRESE B TUCKER
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of S. Virginia B. Price by THE BOEING COMPANY. *FILING FEE PAID: 11/12/19. (SIMONS, ADAM) Modified on 11/6/2019 (jaa, ). Modified on 11/12/2019 (jaa, ).
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by THE BOEING COMPANY.(SIMONS, ADAM)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by THE BOEING COMPANY.(SIMONS, ADAM)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BOEING COMMERCIAL AIRPLANES, THE BOEING COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE204218.), filed by TIMYKA BOLDEN. (Attachments: #1 CASE FORMS)(jl, )
September 25, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by TIMYKA BOLDEN. (jl, )
September 25, 2019 2 Summons Issued as to BOEING COMMERCIAL AIRPLANES, THE BOEING COMPANY. Forwarded To: HOWARD LEVIN on 9/26/19 (jl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BOLDEN v. THE BOEING COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOEING COMMERCIAL AIRPLANES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE BOEING COMPANY
Represented By: ADAM T. SIMONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMYKA BOLDEN
Represented By: HOWARD J. LEVIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?