INMAN-CLARK v. THE NEIMAN MARCUS GROUP LLC et al
Plaintiff: PARIS INMAN-CLARK
Defendant: THE NEIMAN MARCUS GROUP LTD LLC and THE NEIMAN MARCUS GROUP LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv04717
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MITCHELL S GOLDBERG
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: EXPERT DISCOVERY DUE BY 7/8/2020. (jl, )
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID STRAWBRIDGE FOR SETTLEMENT PURPOSES. ALL FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 4/9/20. ALL EXPERT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 7/8/20. ALL MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DAUBERT MOTIONS ARE DUE BY 7/22/20; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 12/5/19. 12/5/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
December 5, 2019 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG RULE 16 TELEPHONE Conference held on 12/4/19. (jl, )
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 Report Of Rule 26(f) Conference (Joint) by PARIS INMAN-CLARK. (GARNER, MELANIE)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 12/4/2019 11:30 AM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 11/14/19. 11/15/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Christopher P. Allen re: served Answer upon David D. Langfitt, Esquire and Melanie J. Garner, Esquire by Electronic on 11/13/2019, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by THE NEIMAN MARCUS GROUP LLC, THE NEIMAN MARCUS GROUP LTD LLC re #5 Answer to Complaint (ALLEN, CHRISTOPHER)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 Defendants ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by THE NEIMAN MARCUS GROUP LLC, THE NEIMAN MARCUS GROUP LTD LLC.(ALLEN, CHRISTOPHER)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by THE NEIMAN MARCUS GROUP LLC, THE NEIMAN MARCUS GROUP LTD LLC re #3 Notice of Appearance (ALLEN, CHRISTOPHER)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER P. ALLEN on behalf of THE NEIMAN MARCUS GROUP LLC, THE NEIMAN MARCUS GROUP LTD LLC with 11/13/2019(ALLEN, CHRISTOPHER)
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 12(b) PROCEDURAL ORDER (sl, )
October 10, 2019 2 Summons Issued as to THE NEIMAN MARCUS GROUP LLC, THE NEIMAN MARCUS GROUP LTD LLC. GIVEN TO COUNSEL ON 10/10/2019. (bw, )
October 10, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by PARIS INMAN-CLARK. (bw, )
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THE NEIMAN MARCUS GROUP LLC, THE NEIMAN MARCUS GROUP LTD LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE205043.), filed by PARIS INMAN-CLARK. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: INMAN-CLARK v. THE NEIMAN MARCUS GROUP LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PARIS INMAN-CLARK
Represented By: MELANIE J. GARNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE NEIMAN MARCUS GROUP LTD LLC
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER P. ALLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE NEIMAN MARCUS GROUP LLC
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER P. ALLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?