D F PACE, ESQUIRE v. BAKER-WHITE et al
Plaintiff: EMILY BAKER-WHITE and D F PACE, ESQUIRE
Defendant: PLAINVIEW PROJECT, INJUSTICE WATCH and FEDERAL COMMUNITY DEFENDER OFFICE FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA
Case Number: 2:2019cv04827
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: WENDY BEETLESTONE
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER THAT ALL FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE POSTPONED PENDING A DECISION ON THE MOTION TO DISMISS. DEFENDANTS WILL FILE AN ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE COURT'S DENIAL, IN WHOLE OR PART, OF THE MOTION TO DISMISS. THE PARTIES SHALL HAVE 150 DAYS FROM THE FILING OF DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO COMPLETE FACT DISCOVERY; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 12/10/19. 12/11/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
December 10, 2019 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE PRELIMINARY Pretrial Conference held on 12/9/19 (jl, )
December 9, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : MOTION HEARING SET FOR 12/17/2019 01:30 PM IN COURTROOM BEFORE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE.(amw, ) Modified on 12/9/2019 (amw, ).
December 3, 2019 Filing 15 Report Of Rule 26(f) Meeting and Proposed Discovery Plan by INJUSTICE WATCH, PLAINVIEW PROJECT. (TWERSKY, MICHAEL)
December 2, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Support re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by EMILY BAKER-WHITE, INJUSTICE WATCH, PLAINVIEW PROJECT. (TWERSKY, MICHAEL)
November 26, 2019 Filing 13 EXHIBIT A to Plaintiff's Response In Opposition to the Motion of Defendants, Emily-Baker White, Esq., Plainview Project and Injustice Watch to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by D F PACE, ESQUIRE.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B to Plaintiff's Response In Opposition to the Motion of Defendants, Emily-Baker White, Esq., Plainview Project and Injustice Watch to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint)(TUMOLO, LOUIS)
November 25, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by D F PACE, ESQUIRE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(TUMOLO, LOUIS)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO VOLUNTARILY DISMISS DEFENDANT FEDERAL COMMUNITY DEFENDER OFFICE FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA IS GRANTED AND DEFENDANT FEDERAL COMMUNITY DEFENDER OFFICE IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FROM THIS CASE; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 11/14/19.11/19/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 10 Plaintiffs Notice of Voluntarily Dismissal of Defendant Federal Community Defender Office for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. filed by D F PACE, ESQUIRE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(TUMOLO, LOUIS) Modified on 11/14/2019 (fb).
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by BENJAMIN H. MCCOY on behalf of EMILY BAKER-WHITE, INJUSTICE WATCH, PLAINVIEW PROJECT with Certificate of Service(MCCOY, BENJAMIN)
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by EMILY BAKER-WHITE, INJUSTICE WATCH, PLAINVIEW PROJECT.Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(TWERSKY, MICHAEL)
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED CONFERENCE AT THE UNOPPOSED REQUEST OF DEFENDANTS: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE RESET FOR 12/9/2019 05:00 PM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE.(amw, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by FEDERAL COMMUNITY DEFENDER OFFICE FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA.memorandum of law; certificate of service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A Complaint)(KAHN, JAMES)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME WITHIN WHICH DEFENDANT EMILY BAKER-WHITE, ESQUIRE; PLAINVIEW PROJECT AND INJUSTICE WATCH MUST ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE PLEAD IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT SHALL BE EXTENDED TO 11/4/19; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 10/22/19. 10/22/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CONFERENCE: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 11/25/2019 11:30 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE. (Attachments: #1 Electronic Discovery Order, #2 Joint Report and Discovery Plan)(amw, )
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by EMILY BAKER-WHITE, INJUSTICE WATCH, PLAINVIEW PROJECT of Substitution of Counsel (TWERSKY, MICHAEL)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FEDERAL COMMUNITY DEFENDER OFFICE FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA, INJUSTICE WATCH, PLAINVIEW PROJECT. (Attachments: #1 DISCLOSURE, #2 DISCLOSURE)(jaa, )
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FEDERAL COMMUNITY DEFENDER OFFICE FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA from COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF PHILADELPHIA, PENNSYLVANIA, case number SEPTEMBER TERM, 2019 002108. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE205341) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(jaa, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D F PACE, ESQUIRE v. BAKER-WHITE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLAINVIEW PROJECT
Represented By: RUFUS A. JENNINGS
Represented By: MICHAEL K. TWERSKY
Represented By: BENJAMIN H. MCCOY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INJUSTICE WATCH
Represented By: RUFUS A. JENNINGS
Represented By: MICHAEL K. TWERSKY
Represented By: BENJAMIN H. MCCOY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL COMMUNITY DEFENDER OFFICE FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: MOHAMMAD A. GHIASUDDIN
Represented By: JAMES R. KAHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMILY BAKER-WHITE
Represented By: RUFUS A. JENNINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D F PACE, ESQUIRE
Represented By: LOUIS TUMOLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?