ROMERO v. GUARDICORE, INC.
Plaintiff: ANTONIO ROMERO
Defendant: GUARDICORE, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv04932
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT A PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON JANUARY 22, 2020, AT 4:00 PM IN THE UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, ROOM 8613, PHILADELPHIA, PA. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT: A PARTY MUST, WITHOUT AWAITING A DISCOVERY REQUEST, PROVIDE TO OTHER PARTIES THE DISCLOSURES CONTEMPLATED BY RULE 26(A), WITHIN FOURTEEN (14) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER; ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 12/10/19. 12/11/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by KRISTIN L. WITHERELL on behalf of GUARDICORE, INC. with Certificate of Service(WITHERELL, KRISTIN)
October 30, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses by GUARDICORE, INC..(KAYE, MARJORIE)
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by LEANNE LANE COYLE on behalf of ANTONIO ROMERO (COYLE, LEANNE)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by TRACI M. GREENBERG on behalf of ANTONIO ROMERO (GREENBERG, TRACI)
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GUARDICORE, INC..(jl, )
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GUARDICORE, INC. from PHILADELPHIA COURT OF COMMON PLEAS, case number 190902012. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE205590), CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 CASE FORMS)(jl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROMERO v. GUARDICORE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GUARDICORE, INC.
Represented By: MARJORIE KAYE, JR.
Represented By: KRISTIN L. WITHERELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTONIO ROMERO
Represented By: SIDNEY L. GOLD
Represented By: TRACI M. GREENBERG
Represented By: LEANNE LANE COYLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?