COOMES v. BROWN et al
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH COOMES
Defendant: ANN CLARY GORDON, ESQ., SHAPIRO SHER, SHAPIRO SHER GUINOT & SANDLER, P.A., MARK L. MILLER, RDQ., AMBASSADOR LUIS GUINOT, JR., DANIEL J. ZELLER, ESQ., PAUL MARK SANDLER, ESQ., SILVERMAN THOMPSON SLUTKIN & WHITE LLC, ERIC R. HARLAN, ESQ., ALEX J. BROWN, ESQ., SHAPIRO, SHER & GUINOT INVESTMENT POOL II LLC, J. PATRICK GILL, ESQ., WILLIAM E. CARLSON, ESQ., DAVID B. APPLEFIELD, ESQ., SCOTT W. FOLEY, ESQ., SHAPIRO SHER GUINOT & SANDLER, JOEL I. SHER, ESQ., ANASTASIA L. MCCUSKER, ESQ., RICHARD M. GOLDBERG, ESQ., SHAPIRO SHER & GUINOT INVESTMENT POOL III LLC, RENEE S. KUNZ, ESQ., SHAPIRO SHER & GUINOT, P.A., RENEE S. LANE KUNZ and DAVID B. APPLEFELD
Case Number: 2:2019cv05244
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MARK A KEARNEY
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 6 Copy of Order/Notice dated 11/7/19 (Document # 2) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to ELIZABETH COOMES for the following reason: UNABLE TO FORWARD. (jaa, )
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 Copy of Order/Notice dated 11/8/19 (Document # 3) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to Elizabeth Coomes for the following reason: Return to Sender, Unable to Fwd.. (fdc, )
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION AND THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THIS MATTER CLOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 12/13/19. 12/13/19 ENTERED AND COPY MAILED TO COOMES. (fdc)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED THAT IF PLAINTIFF SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS CASE, SHE MUST, NO LATER THAN DECEMBER 9, 2019, EITHER (1) PAY $400 TO THE CLERK OF COURT, OR (2) FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AS OUTLINED HEREIN. THE LERK OF COURT SHALL PROVIDE PLAINTIFF WITH A NON-PRISONER APLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 11/8/19. 11/12/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PLAINTIFF WITH FORM.(jaa, ) Modified on 11/13/2019 (lisad, ).
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES. Mailed to pro se plff on 11/7/19. (kw, )
November 5, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by PRO SE PLFF ELIZABETH COOMES. (kw, )
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DAVID B. APPLEFELD, ESQ, ALEX J. BROWN, ESQ, WILLIAM E. CARLSON, ESQ, SCOTT W. FOLEY, ESQ, J. PATRICK GILL, ESQ, RICHARD M. GOLDBERG, ESQ, ANN CLARY GORDON, ESQ, AMBASSADOR LUIS GUINOT, JR, ERIC R. HARLAN, ESQ, RENEE S. LANE KUNZ, ESQ, ANASTASIA L. MCCUSKER, ESQ, MARK L. MILLER, RDQ, PAUL MARK SANDLER, ESQ, SHAPIRO SHER, SHAPIRO SHER & GUINOT INVESTMENT POOL III LLC, SHAPIRO SHER & GUINOT, P.A., SHAPIRO SHER GUINOT & SANDLER, SHAPIRO SHER GUINOT & SANDLER, P.A., SHAPIRO, SHER & GUINOT INVESTMENT POOL II LLC, JOEL I. SHER, ESQ, SILVERMAN THOMPSON SLUTKIN & WHITE LLC, DANIEL J. ZELLER, ESQ (NO IFP, NO FILING FEE), filed by PRO SE PLFF ELIZABETH COOMES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) "NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED)(kw, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/7/2019: #2 Civil Cover Sheets) (kw, ). Modified on 11/8/2019 (lisad, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COOMES v. BROWN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANN CLARY GORDON, ESQ.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHAPIRO SHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHAPIRO SHER GUINOT & SANDLER, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK L. MILLER, RDQ.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMBASSADOR LUIS GUINOT, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL J. ZELLER, ESQ.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL MARK SANDLER, ESQ.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SILVERMAN THOMPSON SLUTKIN & WHITE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC R. HARLAN, ESQ.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX J. BROWN, ESQ.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHAPIRO, SHER & GUINOT INVESTMENT POOL II LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. PATRICK GILL, ESQ.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM E. CARLSON, ESQ.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID B. APPLEFIELD, ESQ.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT W. FOLEY, ESQ.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHAPIRO SHER GUINOT & SANDLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOEL I. SHER, ESQ.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANASTASIA L. MCCUSKER, ESQ.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD M. GOLDBERG, ESQ.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHAPIRO SHER & GUINOT INVESTMENT POOL III LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RENEE S. KUNZ, ESQ.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHAPIRO SHER & GUINOT, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RENEE S. LANE KUNZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID B. APPLEFELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH COOMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?