BOPP et al v. HOPKINS FORD
Plaintiff: TAMMY K. BOPP and GLENN BOPP
Defendant: HOPKINS FORD
Case Number: 2:2019cv05303
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL M BAYLSON
Referring Judge: GENE EK PRATTER
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing:PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 2/11/2020 04:00 PM BEFORE HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF WILL INITIATE THE TELEPHONE CONFERENCE AND WHEN ALL COUNSEL ARE ON THE LINE, CALL CHAMBERS AT 267-299-7520. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement)(lds, )
January 3, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint together with Affirmative Defenses of Defendant, Hopkins Ford with Affirmative Defenses by HOPKINS FORD.(LEONARD, RYAN) Modified on 1/7/2020 (tjd).
January 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by RYAN L. LEONARD on behalf of HOPKINS FORD (LEONARD, RYAN)
December 5, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GLENN BOPP, TAMMY K. BOPP re: patrick mccloskey served Summons and Complaint upon HOPKINS FORD by personal service. HOPKINS FORD served on 12/3/2019, answer due 12/24/2019. (COCCO, ROBERT)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER TO HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 11/18/19. 11/18/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(jaa, )
November 12, 2019 1 Summons Issued as to HOPKINS FORD. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 11/13/2019 (bw, )
November 12, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by GLENN BOPP, TAMMY K. BOPP. (bw, )
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HOPKINS FORD ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE206692.), filed by GLENN BOPP, TAMMY K. BOPP.(bw, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/13/2019) (bw, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BOPP et al v. HOPKINS FORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOPKINS FORD
Represented By: RYAN L. LEONARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAMMY K. BOPP
Represented By: ROBERT P. COCCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLENN BOPP
Represented By: ROBERT P. COCCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?