ALGARIN-BARNES v. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Plaintiff: JENNIFER ALGARIN-BARNES
Defendant: CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Case Number: 2:2019cv05308
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOHN M YOUNGE
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA.(UNTERBURGER, DANIEL)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER THAT FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 3/3/2020. EXPERT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 4/14/2020. ALL MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DAUBERT MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED BY 5/14/2020. A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 9/15/2020, AT 2:00 PM, IN ROOM 4007. FURTHER DEADLINES OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 12/4/2019. 12/5/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
December 4, 2019 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE Pretrial Conference held on 12/4/2019(amas)
December 3, 2019 Filing 7 Copy of Order/Notice dated 11/14/2019 (Document # 3) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to CITY OF PHILADELPHIA for the following reason: NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED. (amas)
December 3, 2019 Filing 6 Report Of Rule 16 and 26(f) Meeting by JENNIFER ALGARIN-BARNES. (AUERBACH, STEVEN)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by JENNIFER ALGARIN-BARNES OF SERVICE OF INITIAL DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 26(a)(1) (AUERBACH, STEVEN)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL R. UNTERBURGER on behalf of CITY OF PHILADELPHIA with Certificate of Service(UNTERBURGER, DANIEL)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT A F.R.C.P. 16 CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD ON 12/4/2019 AT 3:30 P.M., IN CHAMBERS (ROOM 4007), U.S. COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILA., PA. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PARTIES SHALL MAKE THE REQUIRED INITIAL DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 26(a) WITHIN 14 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 11/14/19. 11/15/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED TO UNREP PARTY.(kw, )
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JENNIFER ALGARIN-BARNES. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA waiver sent on 11/12/2019, answer due 1/11/2020. (AUERBACH, STEVEN)
November 12, 2019 1 Summons Issued as to CITY OF PHILADELPHIA. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 11/12/2019 (bw, )
November 12, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by JENNIFER ALGARIN-BARNES. (bw, )
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CITY OF PHILADELPHIA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE206649.), filed by JENNIFER ALGARIN-BARNES.(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALGARIN-BARNES v. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Represented By: DANIEL R. UNTERBURGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER ALGARIN-BARNES
Represented By: STEVEN AUERBACH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?