REALPE v. UNITED HEALTH GROUP, INC. et al
Plaintiff: JASALYN REALPE
Defendant: OPTUM SERVICES, INC. and UNITED HEALTH GROUP, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv05320
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GERALD J PAPPERT
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by AMANDA ELIZABETH STEINKE on behalf of OPTUM SERVICES, INC. with Certificate of Service(STEINKE, AMANDA)
December 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHANIE JILL PEET on behalf of OPTUM SERVICES, INC. with Certificate of Service(PEET, STEPHANIE)
December 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by AMANDA ELIZABETH STEINKE on behalf of UNITED HEALTH GROUP, INC. with Certificate of Service(STEINKE, AMANDA)
December 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHANIE JILL PEET on behalf of UNITED HEALTH GROUP, INC. with Certificate of Service(PEET, STEPHANIE)
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JASALYN REALPE. UNITED HEALTH GROUP, INC. waiver sent on 12/4/2019, answer due 2/2/2020. (GOLD, SIDNEY)
December 6, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JASALYN REALPE. OPTUM SERVICES, INC. waiver sent on 12/4/2019, answer due 2/2/2020. (GOLD, SIDNEY)
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JASALYN REALPE re: Joseph Connelly served Summons and Complaint upon OPTUM SERVICES, INC., UNITED HEALTH GROUP, INC. by Personal Service. OPTUM SERVICES, INC. served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019; UNITED HEALTH GROUP, INC. served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019. (fdc, )
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM RIESER on behalf of JASALYN REALPE (RIESER, WILLIAM)
November 12, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by JASALYN REALPE. (jl, )
November 12, 2019 2 Summons Issued as to OPTUM SERVICES, INC., UNITED HEALTH GROUP, INC.. Forwarded To: SIDNEY GOLD on 11/13/19 (jl, )
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against OPTUM SERVICES, INC., UNITED HEALTH GROUP, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE206676.), filed by JASALYN REALPE, JURY TRIAL. (Attachments: #1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(jl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: REALPE v. UNITED HEALTH GROUP, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASALYN REALPE
Represented By: SIDNEY L. GOLD
Represented By: WILLIAM RIESER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPTUM SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: STEPHANIE JILL PEET
Represented By: AMANDA ELIZABETH STEINKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED HEALTH GROUP, INC.
Represented By: STEPHANIE JILL PEET
Represented By: AMANDA ELIZABETH STEINKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?