D'AMBRA v. SAUL
Plaintiff: KELSON GREGORY D'AMBRA
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv05327
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: HENRY S PERKIN
Referring Judge: CYNTHIA M RUFE
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service by U.S. ATTORNEY OFFICE re: served SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT upon ATTORNEY GENERAL; NANCY BERRYHILL by CERTIFIED MAIL (jl, )
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (jl, )
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN TO HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 11/18/19. 11/19/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, COPY IN U.S. ATTORNEY BIN.(jl, )
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 Social Security Declining Magistrate Consent by KELSON GREGORY D'AMBRA.. (SILVER, JOSEPH)
November 14, 2019 3 Summons Issued as to ANDREW M. SAUL. 2 Summonses Forwarded To: U.S. Marshal on 11/14/19. 1 Summons forwarded to U.S. Attorney on 11/14/19. (DT)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (DT) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/14/2019: #1 Consent or Declination of Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge) (dt, ).
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 Procedural Order 11/14/2019 Entered and copies mailed and e-mailed. (DT)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF 11/14/2019 THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND COMPLAINT, IT IS ORDERED THAT: LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ISSUE SUMMONS. THE MARSHAL FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONSES AND COMPLAINT IN ACCORDANCE WITH FRCP 4(I). ETC. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SERVE THE U.S. ATTORNEY FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY JUDGE: HENRY S. PERKIN ON 11/14/2019. 11/14/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 CONSENT)(bw, )
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against ANDREW M. SAUL, filed by KELSON GREGORY D'AMBRA.(bw, )
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by KELSON GREGORY D'AMBRA..(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D'AMBRA v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KELSON GREGORY D'AMBRA
Represented By: JOSEPH B SILVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?