THE ESTATE OF PATRICK A. HENRY et al v. CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC et al
Plaintiff: THE ESTATE OF PATRICK A. HENRY and HALEY M. HENRY
Defendant: MS. LAURA BANTA, DR. JOHN DOE, MD, CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC, MATTHEW REESE, G. CLARK, DR. JEFFREY BOLGER, MD, DR. LEE HANUSCHAK, MD, MHM CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC. and JOSEPH TERRA
Case Number: 2:2019cv05466
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by KENNETH D. POWELL, JR on behalf of CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC, LEE HANUSCHAK, MD with Certificate of Service(POWELL, KENNETH)
January 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by EMILY B. RYAN-FIORE on behalf of CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC, LEE HANUSCHAK, MD with Certificate of Service(RYAN-FIORE, EMILY)
January 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by CAITLIN J. GOODRICH on behalf of CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC, LEE HANUSCHAK, MD with Certificate of Service(GOODRICH, CAITLIN)
January 7, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MHM CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC.. MHM CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC. waiver sent on 1/7/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. (NEAL, CASSIDY)
January 7, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JEFFREY BOLGER, MD. JEFFREY BOLGER, MD waiver sent on 1/7/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. (NEAL, CASSIDY)
January 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by CASSIDY L. NEAL on behalf of JEFFREY BOLGER, MD, MHM CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC. with Certificate of Service(NEAL, CASSIDY)
November 21, 2019 8 Summons Issued as to LAURA BANTA, JEFFREY BOLGER, MD, CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC, G. CLARK, LEE HANUSCHAK, MD, MHM CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC., MATTHEW REESE, JOSEPH TERRA. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 11/21/2019 (bw, )
November 21, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by HALEY M. HENRY, THE ESTATE OF PATRICK A. HENRY. (bw, )
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE207167.), filed by HALEY M. HENRY, THE ESTATE OF PATRICK A. HENRY.(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THE ESTATE OF PATRICK A. HENRY et al v. CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MS. LAURA BANTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. JOHN DOE, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC
Represented By: EMILY B. RYAN-FIORE
Represented By: CAITLIN J. GOODRICH
Represented By: KENNETH D. POWELL, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW REESE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. CLARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. JEFFREY BOLGER, MD
Represented By: CASSIDY L. NEAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. LEE HANUSCHAK, MD
Represented By: EMILY B. RYAN-FIORE
Represented By: CAITLIN J. GOODRICH
Represented By: KENNETH D. POWELL, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MHM CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: CASSIDY L. NEAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH TERRA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE ESTATE OF PATRICK A. HENRY
Represented By: WILLIAM M. DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HALEY M. HENRY
Represented By: WILLIAM M. DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?