CUADRADO v. FIRST STUDENT INC. et al
Plaintiff: NICOLAS CUADRADO
Defendant: FIRST STUDENT INC., JOHN DOE and RONALD PALMER
Case Number: 2:2019cv05483
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: TIMOTHY J SAVAGE
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND TO STATE COURT, AND AFTER A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THIS ACTIN IS REMANDED TO THE STATE COURT FROM WHICH IT WAS REMOVED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 1/16/20.1/17/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
January 2, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by FIRST STUDENT INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(GILLIN, DANIEL)
December 24, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Remand filed by NICOLAS CUADRADO.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(GOMPERS, GEOFFREY)
December 23, 2019 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART Telephonic Pretrial Scheduling Conference held on 12/23/2019. (nd, )
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED TO BE HELD ON 3/31/2020 AT 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 3D. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART ON 12/23/2019. 12/23/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd, )
December 19, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE against FIRST STUDENT INC., RONALD PALMER filed by NICOLAS CUADRADO.(jaa, )
December 19, 2019 1 Summons Issued as to RONALD PALMER. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 12/20/19 (jaa, )
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 15(A) IS GRANTED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 12/18/19.12/19/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDERED THAT TELEPHONIC PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 12/23/2019 10:30 AM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART ON 12/18/19. 12/18/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, )
December 17, 2019 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE Initial Pretrial Conference held on 12/17/19 (jaa, )
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: COUNSEL SHALL PARTICIPATE IN A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE TO BE SCHEDULED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART; FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 6/23/2020 10:00 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. DISCOVERY DUE BY 4/17/2020. MOTIONS DUE BY 5/1/2020. MOTION IN LIMINE DUE BY 6/5/2020. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 5/1/2020. PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 5/29/2020. DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 5/29/2020. TRIAL DATE SET FOR 6/25/2020 09:00 AM IN COURTROOM BEFORE HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 12/17/19. 12/18/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, ) (Main Document 9 replaced on 1/2/2020) (jaa, ).
December 17, 2019 Filing 8 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a) filed by NICOLAS CUADRADO. Memorandum of Law In Support, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(GOMPERS, GEOFFREY) Modified on 12/19/2019 (tjd).
December 10, 2019 Filing 7 Report Of Rule 26(f) Meeting by NICOLAS CUADRADO. (GOMPERS, GEOFFREY)
December 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by GEOFFREY B. GOMPERS on behalf of NICOLAS CUADRADO with Certificate of Service(GOMPERS, GEOFFREY)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint together with with affirmative defenses by FIRST STUDENT INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(STOLYAR, VICTORIYA)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD ON 12/17/2019 AT 9:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 11/25/19. 11/25/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL J. GILLIN on behalf of FIRST STUDENT INC. (GILLIN, DANIEL)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent FIRSTGROUP, PLC. for FIRST STUDENT INC.. by FIRST STUDENT INC..(bw, )
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FIRST STUDENT INC. from COURT OF COMMON PLEAS PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, case number 191002707. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE207197)(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CUADRADO v. FIRST STUDENT INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIRST STUDENT INC.
Represented By: VICTORIYA STOLYAR
Represented By: DANIEL J. GILLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD PALMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICOLAS CUADRADO
Represented By: JOEL J. KOFSKY
Represented By: GEOFFREY B. GOMPERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?