ROGERS v. A.O. SMITH CORP et al
Plaintiff: ROBERT A. ROGERS
Defendant: TEXTRON, SELBY BATTERSBY AND COMPANY, GOODYEAR CANADA, ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, LENNOX INDUSTRIES, GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER CO, CLERK EQUIPMENT COMPANY, COPES VULCAN, ALLEN BRADLEY COMPANY, CRANE CO., CLARK CONTROLLER CO., GREENE TWEED & CO, CLEAVER BROOKS, LYCOMING, FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL, MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GOULDS PUMPS, BLACKMER PUMPS, BELL & GOSSET/DOMESTIC PUMP, AMTICO DIVISION OF AMERICAN BILTRITE, CARRIER CORPORATION, AVCO, VELCAN VALVE, KOHLER COMPANY, WEIR VALVE & CONTROLS USA, IMO INDUSTRIES INC., PARKER HANNIFIN, FOSTER WHEELER, VIAD CORPORATION, SPIRAX SARCO, ITT CORPORATION, BF GOODRICH COMPANY, A.O. SMITH CORP, GARDNER DENVER, KUNKLE VALVE, BURNHAM, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE, CERTAIN TEED CORPORATION, PENTAIR VALVES & CONTROLS, POWELL VALVES, INGERSOLL RAND & CO, J.A. SEXAUER, BUFFALO PUMPS, INC., BW/IP INC., COCHRANE, INC., AURORA PUMP C/O LYNETTE JONES, A.W. CHESTERTON INC., EATON CORPORATION, CBS CORPORATION, FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL, LLC, AMTICO, VELAN VALVE, CERTAIN-TEED CORPORATION, CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC., METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO., BURNHAM, LLC, GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER CO., IMO INDUSTRIES, INC., A.O. SMITH CORP., ALLEN-BRADLEY COMPANY, GREEN, TWEED & CO., INC., GOULDS PUMPS, INC., CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY, FOSTER WHEELER, LLC and INGERSOLL-RAND & CO.
Case Number: 2:2019cv05544
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 75 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CBS CORPORATION.(MCSHEA, JOHN)
January 17, 2020 Filing 74 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY.(MCSHEA, JOHN)
January 17, 2020 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN P. MCSHEA on behalf of CBS CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(MCSHEA, JOHN)
January 17, 2020 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN P. MCSHEA on behalf of GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY with Certificate of Service(MCSHEA, JOHN)
January 17, 2020 Filing 71 ANSWER to Complaint together with Amended Complaint , Jury Demand, Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by PENTAIR VALVES & CONTROLS.(KADISH, ERIC)
January 17, 2020 Filing 70 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by A.O. SMITH CORP..(KADISH, ERIC)
January 17, 2020 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC J. KADISH on behalf of A.O. SMITH CORP. with Certificate of Service(KADISH, ERIC)
January 17, 2020 Filing 68 ANSWER to #50 Answer to Complaint,,,,, Crossclaim,,,, , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by J.A. SEXAUER.(RAU, TIMOTHY)
January 17, 2020 Filing 67 ANSWER to #41 Amended Complaint,,,, , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by WEIR VALVE & CONTROLS USA.(RAU, TIMOTHY)
January 17, 2020 Filing 66 ANSWER to Complaint together with Amended Complaint , Jury Demand, Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by KUNKLE VALVE.(KADISH, ERIC)
January 17, 2020 Filing 65 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by WEIR VALVE & CONTROLS USA.(RAU, TIMOTHY)
January 17, 2020 Filing 64 ANSWER to Complaint together with Amended Complaint , Jury Demand, Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL, LLC.(KADISH, ERIC)
January 17, 2020 Filing 63 ANSWER to Complaint together with Amended Complaint , Jury Demand, Affirmative Defenses and all Cross Claims by A.O. SMITH CORP..(KADISH, ERIC)
January 17, 2020 Filing 62 ANSWER to #41 Amended Complaint,,,, by J.A. SEXAUER.(RAU, TIMOTHY)
January 17, 2020 Filing 61 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by J.A. SEXAUER.(RAU, TIMOTHY)
January 16, 2020 Filing 60 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by AMTICO DIVISION OF AMERICAN BILTRITE.(MCMEEKIN, JOHN)
January 16, 2020 Filing 59 ANSWER to #41 Amended Complaint,,,, , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by AMTICO DIVISION OF AMERICAN BILTRITE.(MCMEEKIN, JOHN)
January 16, 2020 Filing 58 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC.(A DIVISION OF AQUA-CHEM, INC.).(VALINIS, SUSAN)
January 16, 2020 Filing 57 ANSWER to #41 Amended Complaint,,,, Affirmative Defenses; Cross-Claims; and Answer to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CLEAVER BROOKS, INC. (VALINIS, SUSAN) Modified on 1/17/2020 (lisad, ).
January 14, 2020 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by INGRID H. GRAFF on behalf of EATON CORPORATION (GRAFF, INGRID)
January 14, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by TIFFANY GIANGIULIO on behalf of EATON CORPORATION (GIANGIULIO, TIFFANY)
January 14, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by TIFFANY GIANGIULIO on behalf of BLACKMER PUMPS (GIANGIULIO, TIFFANY)
January 13, 2020 Filing 53 ANSWER to #41 Amended Complaint,,,, and Cross Claims by ITT CORPORATION.(ARTHUR, AARON)
January 13, 2020 Filing 52 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by ITT CORPORATION.(ARTHUR, AARON)
January 13, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by AARON ARTHUR on behalf of ITT CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(ARTHUR, AARON)
January 13, 2020 Filing 50 ANSWER to Complaint Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against A.O. SMITH CORP., A.W. CHESTERTON INC., ALLEN-BRADLEY COMPANY, AMTICO, ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, AURORA PUMP C/O LYNETTE JONES, AVCO, BELL & GOSSET/DOMESTIC PUMP, BF GOODRICH COMPANY, BLACKMER PUMPS, BUFFALO PUMPS, INC., BURNHAM, LLC, BW/IP INC., CARRIER CORPORATION, CBS CORPORATION, CERTAIN-TEED CORPORATION, CLARK CONTROLLER CO., CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY, CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC., COCHRANE, INC., COPES VULCAN, CRANE CO., EATON CORPORATION, FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL, LLC, FOSTER WHEELER, LLC, GARDNER DENVER, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GOODYEAR CANADA, GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER CO., GOULDS PUMPS, INC., GREEN, TWEED & CO., INC., INGERSOLL-RAND & CO., ITT CORPORATION, J.A. SEXAUER, KOHLER COMPANY, KUNKLE VALVE, LENNOX INDUSTRIES, LYCOMING, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO., MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING, PARKER HANNIFIN, PENTAIR VALVES & CONTROLS, POWELL VALVES, SELBY BATTERSBY AND COMPANY, SPIRAX SARCO, TEXTRON, VELAN VALVE, VIAD CORPORATION, WEIR VALVE & CONTROLS USA by IMO INDUSTRIES, INC..(FONTAK, JOSEPH)
January 10, 2020 Filing 49 ANSWER to #41 Amended Complaint,, CROSSCLAIM , JURY DEMAND against All Defendants by AVCO.(BAILEY, MEGAN) Modified on 1/10/2020 (kp, ).
January 10, 2020 Filing 48 ANSWER to #41 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM , JURY DEMAND against All Defendants by TEXTRON.(BAILEY, MEGAN) Modified on 1/10/2020 (kp, ).
January 10, 2020 Filing 47 ANSWER to #41 Amended Complaint,,,, Reply to Crossclaims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING.(DISIPIO, BASIL)
January 2, 2020 Filing 46 ANSWER to #41 Amended Complaint,,,, with affirmative defenses, answer to all crossclaims, jury demand, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by A.W. CHESTERTON INC..(TURLIK, JOHN)
January 2, 2020 Filing 45 ANSWER to #41 Amended Complaint,,,, with affirmative defenses, answer to all crossclaims, jury demand, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by BW/IP INC..(TURLIK, JOHN)
January 2, 2020 Filing 44 ANSWER to #41 Amended Complaint,,,, Jury Demand, Affirmative Defenses, Denial of All Crossclaims and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by BF GOODRICH COMPANY.(DEZII, DAWN)
December 31, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by LEAH A. LEWIS on behalf of CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC. with Jury Demand(LEWIS, LEAH)
December 31, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. VALINIS on behalf of CLEAVER BROOKS(A DIVISION OF AQUA-CHEM) with Jury Demand(VALINIS, SUSAN)
December 30, 2019 (30) Summons on Amended Complaint Issued as to A.O. SMITH CORP., ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, AURORA PUMP C/O LYNETTE JONES, BELL & GOSSET/DOMESTIC PUMP, BLACKMER PUMPS, BURNHAM, LLC, CBS CORPORATION, CERTAIN-TEED CORPORATION, CLARK CONTROLLER CO., CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY, CLEAVER BROOKS, LLC, COCHRANE, INC., COPES VULCAN, EATON CORPORATION, FOSTER WHEELER, LLC, GARDNER DENVER, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GOULDS PUMPS,INC., GREENE, TWEED & CO.,INC., INGERSOLL-RAND & CO., J.A. SEXAUER, KOHLER COMPANY, LENNOX INDUSTRIES, LYCOMING, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO., PARKER HANNIFIN, POWELL VALVES, SELBY BATTERSBY AND COMPANY, SPIRAX SARCO, VELAN VALVE. Forwarded To: counsel on 12/30/19. (kw, )
December 27, 2019 Filing 41 AMENDED COMPLAINT against A.O. SMITH CORP., A.W. CHESTERTON INC., ALLEN BRADLEY COMPANY, AMTICO DIVISION OF AMERICAN BILTRITE, ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, AURORA PUMP C/O LYNETTE JONES, AVCO, BELL & GOSSET/DOMESTIC PUMP, BF GOODRICH COMPANY, BLACKMER PUMPS, BUFFALO PUMPS, INC., BURNHAM, LLC, BW/IP INC., CARRIER CORPORATION, CBS CORPORATION, CERTAIN-TEED CORPORATION, CLARK CONTROLLER CO., CLEAVER BROOKS, LLC, CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY, COCHRANE, INC., COPES VULCAN, CRANE CO., EATON CORPORATION, FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL, LLC, FOSTER WHEELER, LLC, GARDNER DENVER, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GOODYEAR CANADA, GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER CO., GOULDS PUMPS INC., GREENE, TWEED & CO., INC., IMO INDUSTRIES INC., INGERSOLL-RAND & CO, ITT CORPORATION, J.A. SEXAUER, KOHLER COMPANY, LENNOX INDUSTRIES, LYCOMING, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO., MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING, PARKER HANNIFIN, PENTAIR VALVES & CONTROLS, POWELL VALVES, SELBY BATTERSBY AND COMPANY, SPIRAX SARCO, TEXTRON, VELAN VALVE, VIAD CORPORATION, WEIR VALVE & CONTROLS USA, filed by PLFF ROBERT A. ROGERS.(kw, )
December 27, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY D. RAU on behalf of WEIR VALVE & CONTROLS USA (RAU, TIMOTHY)
December 23, 2019 Filing 39 ANSWER to Complaint with Separate Defenses, Denial of Crossclaims, Jury Trial Demand and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by BF GOODRICH COMPANY.(DEZII, DAWN)
December 20, 2019 Filing 38 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by BF GOODRICH COMPANY.(DEZII, DAWN)
December 20, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by DAWN DEZII on behalf of BF GOODRICH COMPANY with Certificate of Service(DEZII, DAWN)
December 19, 2019 Filing 36 ANSWER to Complaint With Affirmative Defenses & Reply to Cross-Claims of Defendants & Additional Defendants and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING.(DISIPIO, BASIL)
December 19, 2019 Filing 35 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING.(DISIPIO, BASIL)
December 19, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by BASIL A. DISIPIO on behalf of MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING with Demand for Jury Trial and Certificate of Service(DISIPIO, BASIL)
December 19, 2019 Filing 33 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by KUNKLE VALVE.(KADISH, ERIC)
December 19, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC J. KADISH on behalf of KUNKLE VALVE with Certificate of Service(KADISH, ERIC)
December 19, 2019 Filing 31 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL.(KADISH, ERIC)
December 19, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC J. KADISH on behalf of FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL with Certificate of Service(KADISH, ERIC)
December 19, 2019 Filing 29 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by PENTAIR VALVES & CONTROLS.(KADISH, ERIC)
December 19, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC J. KADISH on behalf of PENTAIR VALVES & CONTROLS with Certificate of Service(KADISH, ERIC)
December 19, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN C. MCMEEKIN on behalf of GOODYEAR CANADA with Certificate of Service(MCMEEKIN, JOHN)
December 19, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN C. MCMEEKIN on behalf of GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER CO with Certificate of Service(MCMEEKIN, JOHN)
December 19, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN C. MCMEEKIN on behalf of AMTICO DIVISION OF AMERICAN BILTRITE with Certificate of Service of AMERICAN BILTRITE INC. (improperly named as Amtico division of American Biltrite)(MCMEEKIN, JOHN)
December 18, 2019 Filing 24 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including ITT Inc. with Certificate of Service by ITT CORPORATION.(ARTHUR, AARON)
December 18, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by AARON ARTHUR on behalf of ITT CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(ARTHUR, AARON)
December 16, 2019 Filing 22 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Colfax Corporation, Colfax Fluid Handling LLC and IMO Holdings, Inc. by IMO INDUSTRIES INC..(FONTAK, JOSEPH)
December 16, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH I FONTAK on behalf of IMO INDUSTRIES INC. (FONTAK, JOSEPH)
December 12, 2019 Filing 20 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by VIAD CORPORATION.(O'BRIEN, KEVIN)
December 12, 2019 Filing 19 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by VIAD CORPORATION.(O'BRIEN, KEVIN)
December 12, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by VIAD CORPORATION.(O'BRIEN, KEVIN)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER THAT C.A. NOS 19-5544 AND 19-5666 SHALL BE CONSOLIDTED UNDER 19-5544 FOR ALL PURPOSES. C.A. NO. 16-5666 SHALL BE STATISTICALLY CLOSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT CBS CORP'S MOTION TO DISMISS IN C.A. NO. 19-5666 IS GRANTED AND THE COMPLAINTS IN BOTH ACTIONS ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. PLAINTIFF MAY FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT IN C.A. NO. 19-5544 NO LATER THAN 1/10/20. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 12/11/19. 12/12/12 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
December 11, 2019 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by ALLEN BRADLEY COMPANY.(BRUCH, G.)
December 11, 2019 Filing 15 ROCKWELL AUTOMATION INC. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO ALLEN-BRADLEY CO.S ANSWER to Complaint AND JURY DEMAND; AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; CROSS-CLAIMS; AND ANSWER TO CROSS-CLAIMS, CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by ALLEN BRADLEY COMPANY.(BRUCH, G.)
December 11, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR on behalf of ALLEN BRADLEY COMPANY with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(BRUCH, G.)
December 11, 2019 Filing 13 Crane Co.'s ANSWER to Complaint and Jury Demand; Affirmative Defenses; Cross-Claims; and Answer to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by CRANE CO..(BRUCH, G.)
December 11, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR on behalf of CRANE CO. with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(BRUCH, G.)
December 11, 2019 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CARRIER CORPORATION.(STOKES, GREGORY)
December 11, 2019 Filing 10 CARRIER CORPORATIONS ANSWER to Complaint AND JURY DEMAND; AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; CROSS-CLAIMS; AND ANSWER TO CROSS-CLAIMS, CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by CARRIER CORPORATION.(STOKES, GREGORY)
December 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by GREGORY M. STOKES on behalf of CARRIER CORPORATION with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(STOKES, GREGORY)
December 6, 2019 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by A.W. CHESTERTON INC..(TURLIK, JOHN)
December 6, 2019 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Flowserve Corporation by BW/IP INC..(TURLIK, JOHN)
December 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN A. TURLIK on behalf of A.W. CHESTERTON INC. (TURLIK, JOHN)
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by MEGAN KATHLEEN BAILEY on behalf of AVCO, TEXTRON with Certificate of Service(BAILEY, MEGAN)
December 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN A. TURLIK on behalf of BW/IP INC. (TURLIK, JOHN)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by BUFFALO PUMPS, INC. JOINDER AND NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(HOWARTH, JOHN)
December 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN S. HOWARTH on behalf of BUFFALO PUMPS, INC. with Certificate of Service(HOWARTH, JOHN)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by VIAD CORPORATION from COURT OF COMMON PLEAS PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, case number 191003127. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE207329)(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROGERS v. A.O. SMITH CORP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEXTRON
Represented By: MEGAN KATHLEEN BAILEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SELBY BATTERSBY AND COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOODYEAR CANADA
Represented By: JOHN C. MCMEEKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LENNOX INDUSTRIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLERK EQUIPMENT COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COPES VULCAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLEN BRADLEY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE CO.
Represented By: G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLARK CONTROLLER CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREENE TWEED & CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEAVER BROOKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LYCOMING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING
Represented By: BASIL A. DISIPIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Represented By: JOHN P. MCSHEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULDS PUMPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLACKMER PUMPS
Represented By: TIFFANY GIANGIULIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BELL & GOSSET/DOMESTIC PUMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMTICO DIVISION OF AMERICAN BILTRITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARRIER CORPORATION
Represented By: GREGORY M. STOKES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVCO
Represented By: MEGAN KATHLEEN BAILEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VELCAN VALVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KOHLER COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEIR VALVE & CONTROLS USA
Represented By: TIMOTHY D. RAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO INDUSTRIES INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARKER HANNIFIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIAD CORPORATION
Represented By: KEVIN O'BRIEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPIRAX SARCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT CORPORATION
Represented By: AARON ARTHUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BF GOODRICH COMPANY
Represented By: DAWN DEZII
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.O. SMITH CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARDNER DENVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KUNKLE VALVE
Represented By: ERIC J. KADISH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BURNHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CERTAIN TEED CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENTAIR VALVES & CONTROLS
Represented By: ERIC J. KADISH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POWELL VALVES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INGERSOLL RAND & CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.A. SEXAUER
Represented By: TIMOTHY D. RAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.
Represented By: JOHN S. HOWARTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP INC.
Represented By: JOHN A. TURLIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COCHRANE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AURORA PUMP C/O LYNETTE JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. CHESTERTON INC.
Represented By: JOHN A. TURLIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EATON CORPORATION
Represented By: INGRID H. GRAFF
Represented By: TIFFANY GIANGIULIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS CORPORATION
Represented By: JOHN P. MCSHEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL, LLC
Represented By: ERIC J. KADISH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMTICO
Represented By: JOHN C. MCMEEKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VELAN VALVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CERTAIN-TEED CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC.
Represented By: SUSAN M. VALINIS
Represented By: LEAH A. LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BURNHAM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER CO.
Represented By: JOHN C. MCMEEKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: JOSEPH I FONTAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.O. SMITH CORP.
Represented By: ERIC J. KADISH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLEN-BRADLEY COMPANY
Represented By: G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREEN, TWEED & CO., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULDS PUMPS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INGERSOLL-RAND & CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT A. ROGERS
Represented By: ROBERT E. PAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?