THE ESTATE OF ROLAND ALSTON et al v. CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC et al
Plaintiff: SHERHONDA ALSTON and THE ESTATE OF ROLAND ALSTON
Defendant: BRIAN SCHNIEDER, CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC, LAURA BANTA, DR. LEE HANUSCHAK, MD, MCKINNON SHELBY, WAYNE POPOWSKI, EDITH SLOCUM-WILLIAMS, CHADWICK BADORF and MHM CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv05583
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: PAUL S DIAMOND
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LEE HANUSCHAK, MD, CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC. LEE HANUSCHAK, MD waiver sent on 1/9/2020, answer due 3/9/2020; CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC waiver sent on 1/9/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. (GOODRICH, CAITLIN)
January 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by EMILY B. RYAN-FIORE on behalf of CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC, LEE HANUSCHAK, MD with Certificate of Service(RYAN-FIORE, EMILY)
January 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by CAITLIN J. GOODRICH on behalf of CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC, LEE HANUSCHAK, MD with Certificate of Service(GOODRICH, CAITLIN)
January 3, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MCKINNON SHELBY. MCKINNON SHELBY waiver sent on 1/3/2020, answer due 3/3/2020. (NEAL, CASSIDY)
January 3, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MHM CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC.. MHM CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC. waiver sent on 1/3/2020, answer due 3/3/2020. (NEAL, CASSIDY)
January 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by CASSIDY L. NEAL on behalf of MHM CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC., MCKINNON SHELBY with Certificate of Service(NEAL, CASSIDY)
December 2, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER OUTLINED HEREIN.SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 12/2/2019. 12/2/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt)
November 27, 2019 9 Summons Issued as to CHADWICK BADORF, LAURA BANTA, CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC, LEE HANUSCHAK, MD, MHM CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC., WAYNE POPOWSKI, BRIAN SCHNIEDER, MCKINNON SHELBY, EDITH SLOCUM-WILLIAMS. Forwarded To: PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 11/27/2019 (amas)
November 27, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by SHERHONDA ALSTON, THE ESTATE OF ROLAND ALSTON. (amas)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CHADWICK BADORF, LAURA BANTA, CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC, LEE HANUSCHAK, MD, MHM CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC., WAYNE POPOWSKI, BRIAN SCHNIEDER, MCKINNON SHELBY, EDITH SLOCUM-WILLIAMS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 207480.), filed by SHERHONDA ALSTON, THE ESTATE OF ROLAND ALSTON . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, DESIGNATION FORM, CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK FORM)(amas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THE ESTATE OF ROLAND ALSTON et al v. CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN SCHNIEDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC
Represented By: EMILY B. RYAN-FIORE
Represented By: CAITLIN J. GOODRICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAURA BANTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. LEE HANUSCHAK, MD
Represented By: EMILY B. RYAN-FIORE
Represented By: CAITLIN J. GOODRICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCKINNON SHELBY
Represented By: CASSIDY L. NEAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAYNE POPOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDITH SLOCUM-WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHADWICK BADORF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MHM CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: CASSIDY L. NEAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHERHONDA ALSTON
Represented By: WILLIAM M. DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE ESTATE OF ROLAND ALSTON
Represented By: WILLIAM M. DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?