LANG v. MERCK & CO., INC. et al
Plaintiff: BEVERLY A. LANG
Defendant: MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. and MERCK & CO., INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv05644
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: HARVEY BARTLE
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BEVERLY A. LANG. MERCK & CO., INC. waiver sent on 12/3/2019, answer due 2/3/2020; MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. waiver sent on 12/3/2019, answer due 2/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(ROCKFORTE, NICHOLAS)
December 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by DINO S. SANGIAMO on behalf of MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. with Certificate of Service(SANGIAMO, DINO)
November 27, 2019 (2) Summons Issued as to MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.. Forwarded To: counsel on 12/2/19. (kw, )
November 27, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by PLFF BEVERLY A. LANG. (kw, )
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. ( Filing fee $400.00 receipt number PPE207508.), filed by BEVERLY A. LANG. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track)(kw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LANG v. MERCK & CO., INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.
Represented By: DINO S. SANGIAMO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCK & CO., INC.
Represented By: DINO S. SANGIAMO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEVERLY A. LANG
Represented By: NICHOLAS R. ROCKFORTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?