ROGERS v. A. O. SMITH CORP. et al
Plaintiff: ROBERT A. ROGERS
Defendant: CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY, FOSTER WHEELER, LLC, TEXTRON, FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL, LLC, A. O. SMITH CORP., GOODYEAR CANADA, ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, LENNOX INDUSTRIES, AURORA PUMP, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, COCHRANE, INC., CRANE CO., CLARK CONTROLLER CO., WEIR VALVE & CONTROLS USA, SELBY BATTERSBY AND COMPANY, BW/IP INC., GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER CO., LYCOMING, CERTAIN-TEED CORPORATION, GREENE TWEED & CO., INC., BLACKMER PUMPS, AMTICO, CARRIER CORPORATION, AVCO, GOULDS PUMPS INC., INGERSOLL-RAND & CO., KOHLER COMPANY, ALLEN-BRADLEY COMPANY, PARKER HANNIFIN, MINNESOLTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING, CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC., VIAD CORPORATION, BURNHAM LLC, ITT CORPORATION, BF GOODRICH COMPANY, VELAN VALVE, GARDNER DENVER, KUNKLE VALVE, INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO., PENTAIR VALVES & CONTROLS, POWELL VALVES, BELL & GOSSETT/DOMESTIC PUMP, J.A. SEXAUER, SPIRAX SARCO, BUFFALO PUMPS, INC., A. W. CHESTERTON, INC., COPES VULCAN, EATON CORPORATION, CBS CORPORATION and IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv05666
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Filing 24 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (mbh, )
December 17, 2019 Filing 23 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by A. O. SMITH CORP..(KADISH, ERIC)
December 17, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC J. KADISH on behalf of A. O. SMITH CORP. with Certificate of Service(KADISH, ERIC)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER THAT C.A. NOS 19-5544 AND 19-5666 SHALL BE CONSOLIDTED UNDER 19-5544 FOR ALL PURPOSES. C.A. NO. 16-5666 SHALL BE STATISTICALLY CLOSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT CBS CORP'S MOTION TO DISMISS IN C.A. NO. 19-5666 IS GRANTED AND THE COMPLAINTS IN BOTH ACTIONS ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. PLAINTIFF MAY FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT IN C.A. NO. 19-5544 NO LATER THAN 1/10/20. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 12/11/19. 12/12/12 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
December 11, 2019 Filing 20 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by ALLEN-BRADLEY COMPANY.(BRUCH, G.)
December 11, 2019 Filing 19 ROCKWELL AUTOMATION INC. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO ALLEN-BRADLEY CO.S ANSWER to Complaint AND JURY DEMAND; AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; CROSS-CLAIMS; AND ANSWER TO CROSS-CLAIMS, CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by ALLEN-BRADLEY COMPANY.(BRUCH, G.)
December 11, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR on behalf of ALLEN-BRADLEY COMPANY with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(BRUCH, G.)
December 11, 2019 Filing 17 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CRANE CO..(BRUCH, G.)
December 11, 2019 Filing 16 Crane Co.'s ANSWER to Complaint and Jury Demand; Affirmative Defenses; Cross-Claims; and Answer to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by CRANE CO..(BRUCH, G.)
December 11, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR on behalf of CRANE CO. with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(BRUCH, G.)
December 11, 2019 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CARRIER CORPORATION.(STOKES, GREGORY)
December 11, 2019 Filing 13 CARRIER CORPORATION'S ANSWER to Complaint AND JURY DEMAND; AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; CROSS-CLAIMS; AND ANSWER TO CROSS-CLAIMS, CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by CARRIER CORPORATION.(STOKES, GREGORY)
December 11, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by GREGORY M. STOKES on behalf of CARRIER CORPORATION with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(STOKES, GREGORY)
December 10, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM of GE and CBS filed by ROBERT A. ROGERS. (PAUL, ROBERT)
December 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by JULIO NAVARRO on behalf of KOHLER COMPANY with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(NAVARRO, JULIO)
December 6, 2019 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by A. W. CHESTERTON, INC..(TURLIK, JOHN)
December 6, 2019 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Flowserve Corporation by BW/IP INC..(TURLIK, JOHN)
December 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN A. TURLIK on behalf of A. W. CHESTERTON, INC. (TURLIK, JOHN)
December 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by MEGAN KATHLEEN BAILEY on behalf of AVCO, TEXTRON with Certificate of Service(BAILEY, MEGAN)
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN A. TURLIK on behalf of BW/IP INC. (TURLIK, JOHN)
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CBS CORPORATION.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(MCSHEA, JOHN)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent NATIONAL AMUSEMENTS, INC., Corporate Parent GAMCO INVESTORS, INC. for CBS CORPORATION, Certificate of Service, filed by DEFT CBS CORPORATION.(kw, )
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1, Certificate of Service, filed by DEFT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY.(kw, )
November 27, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by DEFTS CBS CORPORATION, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (kw, )
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CBS CORPORATION, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY from Court of Common Pleas of Phila. County, PA, Certificate of Service, case number 191003127. (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number PPE207595) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheets)(kw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROGERS v. A. O. SMITH CORP. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLARK EQUIPMENT COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEXTRON
Represented By: MEGAN KATHLEEN BAILEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. O. SMITH CORP.
Represented By: ERIC J. KADISH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOODYEAR CANADA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LENNOX INDUSTRIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AURORA PUMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Represented By: JOHN P. MCSHEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COCHRANE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE CO.
Represented By: G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLARK CONTROLLER CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEIR VALVE & CONTROLS USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SELBY BATTERSBY AND COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP INC.
Represented By: JOHN A. TURLIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LYCOMING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CERTAIN-TEED CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREENE TWEED & CO., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLACKMER PUMPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMTICO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARRIER CORPORATION
Represented By: GREGORY M. STOKES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVCO
Represented By: MEGAN KATHLEEN BAILEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULDS PUMPS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INGERSOLL-RAND & CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KOHLER COMPANY
Represented By: JULIO NAVARRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLEN-BRADLEY COMPANY
Represented By: G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARKER HANNIFIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MINNESOLTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIAD CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BURNHAM LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BF GOODRICH COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VELAN VALVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARDNER DENVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KUNKLE VALVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENTAIR VALVES & CONTROLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POWELL VALVES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BELL & GOSSETT/DOMESTIC PUMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.A. SEXAUER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPIRAX SARCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. W. CHESTERTON, INC.
Represented By: JOHN A. TURLIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COPES VULCAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EATON CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS CORPORATION
Represented By: JOHN P. MCSHEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT A. ROGERS
Represented By: ROBERT E. PAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?