FREITAG v. BUCKS COUNTY et al
Plaintiff: CHARLES JOSEPH FREITAG, JR.
Defendant: PRIMECARE MEDICAL, INC., CHRISTINA PENGE, LPC, STEPHAN BRAUTIGAM, PMHNP, AVIA JAMES, LPC, JOHN DOES 1-10, JESSICA MAHONEY, PSY.D, BUCKS COUNTY, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER YOUNG, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER MOODY and CORRECTIONAL OFFICER MURPHY
Case Number: 2:2019cv05750
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: TIMOTHY J SAVAGE
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2020 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT against STEPHAN BRAUTIGAM, PMHNP, BUCKS COUNTY, AVIA JAMES, LPC, JESSICA MAHONEY, PSY.D, CHRISTINA PENGE, LPC, PRIMECARE MEDICAL, INC., CORRECTIONAL OFFICER MOODY, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER MURPHY, CORRECTIONAL OFFICER YOUNG, filed by CHARLES JOSEPH FREITAG, JR.(fdc, )
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED #16 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE AMENDED COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO THE MOTION IS DEEMED FILED AS OF THIS DATE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 1/30/20.1/31/20 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR TUESDAY, 2/4/20 AT 9:00 AM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART ON 1/30/20. 1/30/20 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER. ORDER THAT COUNSEL SHALL PARTICIPATE IN A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE TO BE SCHEDULED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART. A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 11/3/20 AT 10:00 AM IN CHAMBERS {ROOM 9614) BEFORE HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE, ALL FACT DISCOVERY IS DUE BY 6/30/20, DAUBERT MOTIONS ARE DUE BY 9/8/20, MOTIONS IN LIMINE ARE DUE BY 10/13/20, MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ARE DUE BY 9/8/20, TRIAL DATE IS SET FOR 11/6/20 AT 9:00 AM IN COURTROOM 9A BEFORE HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 1/29/20. 1/29/20 ENTERED & E-MAILED. (fdc)
January 29, 2020 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. A Pretrial Conference was held on 1/29/20. (fdc)
January 28, 2020 Filing 16 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by CHARLES JOSEPH FREITAG, JR.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint)(FEINBERG, JONATHAN)
January 21, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by FRANK A. CHERNAK on behalf of BUCKS COUNTY with Certificate of Service(CHERNAK, FRANK)
January 21, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by BRETT M. WALDRON on behalf of BUCKS COUNTY with Certificate of Service(WALDRON, BRETT)
January 21, 2020 Filing 13 Discovery Plan by CHARLES JOSEPH FREITAG, JR.(FEINBERG, JONATHAN)
January 17, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Plaintiff's Complaint filed by STEPHAN BRAUTIGAM, PMHNP, AVIA JAMES, LPC, JESSICA MAHONEY, PSY.D, CHRISTINA PENGE, LPC, PRIMECARE MEDICAL, INC..Brief in Support and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(NINOSKY, JOHN)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD ON WEDNESDAY, 1/29/20 AT 8:30 AM IN ROOM 9614 BEFORE HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE.SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 11/13/20. 11/13/20 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
January 10, 2020 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by PRIMECARE MEDICAL, INC..(NINOSKY, JOHN)
January 10, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHRISTINA PENGE, LPC, JESSICA MAHONEY, PSY.D, PRIMECARE MEDICAL, INC., AVIA JAMES, LPC, STEPHAN BRAUTIGAM, PMHNP. CHRISTINA PENGE, LPC waiver sent on 12/10/2019, answer due 2/10/2020; JESSICA MAHONEY, PSY.D waiver sent on 12/10/2019, answer due 2/10/2020; PRIMECARE MEDICAL, INC. waiver sent on 12/10/2019, answer due 2/10/2020; AVIA JAMES, LPC waiver sent on 12/10/2019, answer due 2/10/2020; STEPHAN BRAUTIGAM, PMHNP waiver sent on 12/10/2019, answer due 2/10/2020. (NINOSKY, JOHN)
January 10, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN R. NINOSKY on behalf of STEPHAN BRAUTIGAM, PMHNP, AVIA JAMES, LPC, JESSICA MAHONEY, PSY.D, CHRISTINA PENGE, LPC, PRIMECARE MEDICAL, INC. with Certificate of Service(NINOSKY, JOHN)
December 10, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHARLES JOSEPH FREITAG, JR. BUCKS COUNTY waiver sent on 12/10/2019, answer due 2/8/2020. (FEINBERG, JONATHAN)
December 10, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Certificate of Merit as to Defendant PrimeCare by JONATHAN H. FEINBERG on behalf of CHARLES JOSEPH FREITAG, JR(FEINBERG, JONATHAN)
December 10, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Certificate of Merit as to Defendant Christina Penge by JONATHAN H. FEINBERG on behalf of CHARLES JOSEPH FREITAG, JR(FEINBERG, JONATHAN)
December 10, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Certificate of Merit as to Defendant Jessica Mahoney by JONATHAN H. FEINBERG on behalf of CHARLES JOSEPH FREITAG, JR(FEINBERG, JONATHAN)
December 10, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Certificate of Merit as to Defendant Avia James by JONATHAN H. FEINBERG on behalf of CHARLES JOSEPH FREITAG, JR(FEINBERG, JONATHAN)
December 10, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Certificate of Merit as to Defendant Stephan Brautigam by JONATHAN H. FEINBERG on behalf of CHARLES JOSEPH FREITAG, JR(FEINBERG, JONATHAN)
December 6, 2019 6 Summons Issued as to STEPHAN BRAUTIGAM, PMHNP, BUCKS COUNTY, AVIA JAMES, LPC, JESSICA MAHONEY, PSY.D, CHRISTINA PENGE, LPC, PRIMECARE MEDICAL, INC.. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 12/9/2019 (bw, )
December 6, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by CHARLES JOSEPH FREITAG, JR. (bw, )
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against STEPHAN BRAUTIGAM, PMHNP, BUCKS COUNTY, AVIA JAMES, LPC, JOHN DOES 1-10, JESSICA MAHONEY, PSY.D, CHRISTINA PENGE, LPC, PRIMECARE MEDICAL, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE207906.), filed by CHARLES JOSEPH FREITAG, JR.(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FREITAG v. BUCKS COUNTY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRIMECARE MEDICAL, INC.
Represented By: JOHN R. NINOSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTINA PENGE, LPC
Represented By: JOHN R. NINOSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHAN BRAUTIGAM, PMHNP
Represented By: JOHN R. NINOSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVIA JAMES, LPC
Represented By: JOHN R. NINOSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JESSICA MAHONEY, PSY.D
Represented By: JOHN R. NINOSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUCKS COUNTY
Represented By: BRETT M. WALDRON
Represented By: FRANK A. CHERNAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECTIONAL OFFICER YOUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECTIONAL OFFICER MOODY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECTIONAL OFFICER MURPHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES JOSEPH FREITAG, JR.
Represented By: JONATHAN H. FEINBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?