WARNER v. TRIDENT ASSET MANAGEMENT, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: DANIEL WARNER
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-25, ORION PORTFOLIO SERVICES II, LLC and TRIDENT ASSET MANAGEMENT, L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2019cv05876
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: PETRESE B TUCKER
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by TRIDENT ASSET MANAGEMENT, L.L.C..(CANTER, RONALD)
February 4, 2020 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by ORION PORTFOLIO SERVICES II, LLC.(CANTER, RONALD)
February 4, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Stay and to Extend Defendants' Time to File a Response to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by ORION PORTFOLIO SERVICES II, LLC, TRIDENT ASSET MANAGEMENT, L.L.C..Brief. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Stay and to Extend Time to File Response to Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(CANTER, RONALD)
January 29, 2020 Filing 3 EXHIBIT In Support of Amended Complaint by DANIEL WARNER.. (GARIBIAN, ANTRANIG)
December 30, 2019 2 AMENDED Summons Issued as to ORION PORTFOLIO SERVICES II, LLC, TRIDENT ASSET MANAGEMENT, L.L.C.. Forwarded To: ANTRANIG GARIBIAN on 12/30/19 (jl, )
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against JOHN DOES 1-25, ORION PORTFOLIO SERVICES II, LLC, TRIDENT ASSET MANAGEMENT, L.L.C., filed by DANIEL WARNER, JURY DEMAND.(jl, )
December 13, 2019 2 Summons Issued as to ORION PORTFOLIO SERVICES II, LLC, TRIDENT ASSET MANAGEMENT, L.L.C. Forwarded To: PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 12/16/2019 (amas)
December 13, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by DANIEL WARNER. (amas)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN DOES 1-25, ORION PORTFOLIO SERVICES II, LLC, TRIDENT ASSET MANAGEMENT, L.L.C. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 208249.), filed by DANIEL WARNER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, DESIGNATION FORM, CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK FORM)(amas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WARNER v. TRIDENT ASSET MANAGEMENT, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL WARNER
Represented By: ANTRANIG GARIBIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORION PORTFOLIO SERVICES II, LLC
Represented By: RONALD S. CANTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRIDENT ASSET MANAGEMENT, L.L.C.
Represented By: RONALD S. CANTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?