CRAWFORD et al v. DUARTE
Plaintiff: LORETTA CRAWFORD and BENJAMIN CRAWFORD
Defendant: WASHINGTON DUARTE
Case Number: 2:2019cv05882
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL M BAYLSON
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2021 Filing 22 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT by BENJAMIN CRAWFORD, LORETTA CRAWFORD. (GREENFIELD, MARC)
November 2, 2021 Filing 21 CIVIL JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF BENJAMIN CRAWFORD IN THE AMOUNT OF $15,000.00 (FIFTEEN THOUSAND DOLLARS), AND IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF LORETTA CRAWFORD IN THE AMOUNT OF $15,000.00 (FIFTEEN THOUSAND DOLLARS), BOTH AGAINST DEFENDANT, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ARBITRATION AWARD AND LOCAL CIVIL RULE 53.2, SECTION 6. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 11/2/21. 11/2/21 ENTERED AND COPIES M E-MAILED. COPY TO ARB. (va, ) Modified on 11/2/2021 (va, ).
October 25, 2021 Filing 20 ARBITRATION AWARD DATED 9/30/21. ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(sah)
September 9, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN P. ROSE on behalf of WASHINGTON DUARTE (ROSE, JONATHAN)
September 9, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Brooke Hanley by JONATHAN P. ROSE on behalf of WASHINGTON DUARTE(ROSE, JONATHAN) Modified on 9/13/2021 (md, ).
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ARBITRATION. ALL DOCUMENTARY EVIDENCE, EXCLUDING IMPEACHING DOCUMENTS, SHALL BE MARKED AND EXCHANGED IN ADVANCE. ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 8/16/21. 8/16/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. COPY TO ARB. (va, )
August 3, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by ALEXANDRA SKARKA on behalf of WASHINGTON DUARTE(SKARKA, ALEXANDRA)
August 2, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Hearing: ARBITRATION HEARING SET FOR 9/30/2021 09:30 AM.(cjh, )
May 18, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by BROOKE HANLEY on behalf of WASHINGTON DUARTE with 05/18/2021(HANLEY, BROOKE)
November 4, 2020 Filing 13 Notice Re: Arbitration Videoconference (Attachments: #1 Consent)(ahf, )
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ARBITRATION AND APPOINTING CARLTON B. CUMMINGS, JOSEPH PATRICK MURPHY AND JAMES W. CHRISTIE, III AS ARBITRATORS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 7/10/2020. 7/10/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ahf)
March 27, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing: ARBITRATION HEARING RESCHEDULED FOR 8/12/2020 AT 9:30 AM IN COURTROOM 5-C.(ahf)
March 12, 2020 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE Pretrial Conference held on 03/11/2020. (nd, )
March 9, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing:TELEPHONE CONFERENCE REGARDING THE SCHEDULING OF A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 3/11/2020 09:15 AM BEFORE HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO INITIATE THE CALL. (CHAMBERS PH. 267-299-7790)(dp, )
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: DISCOVERY DUE BY 6/30/2020., MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID STRAWBRIDGE WILL CONTACT COUNSEL AS TO WHETHER SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS HAVE TAKEN PLACE AND TO SCHEDULE A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DUE BY 7/30/2020, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 3/6/20. 3/6/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )
March 6, 2020 Filing 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON. Pretrial Conference held on 03/05/2020. (va, )
March 5, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN A. LIVINGOOD, JR on behalf of WASHINGTON DUARTE (LIVINGOOD, JOHN)
February 26, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing: ARBITRATION HEARING SET FOR 7/8/2020 at 9:30 AM IN COURTROOM 5-C.(ahf)
February 25, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Hearing: PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 3/5/2020 04:00 PM BEFORE HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF WILL INITIATE THE TELEPHONE CONFERENCE AND WHEN ALL COUNSEL ARE ON THE LINE, CALL CHAMBERS AT 267-299-7520. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement)(lds, )
February 25, 2020 Filing 3 DEFENDANT, WASHINGTON DUARTE'S, ANSWER to Complaint WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by WASHINGTON DUARTE.(SKARKA, ALEXANDRA)
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (va, )
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WASHINGTON DUARTE from COURT OF COMMON PLEAS PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, case number 190704622. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE208258)(bw, )
December 13, 2019 Case Eligible for Arbitration(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CRAWFORD et al v. DUARTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WASHINGTON DUARTE
Represented By: ALEXANDRA SKARKA
Represented By: JOHN A. LIVINGOOD, JR.
Represented By: BROOKE HANLEY
Represented By: JONATHAN P. ROSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LORETTA CRAWFORD
Represented By: MARC F. GREENFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BENJAMIN CRAWFORD
Represented By: MARC F. GREENFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?