COTTOM et al v. RITE AID OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC. et al
Plaintiff: MELANIE COTTOM and THERESA COTTOM
Defendant: CITY AND COUNTY OF PHILADELPHIA, RICHARD ROSS, JR., SECURITY RESOURCES INC and RITE AID OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv06062
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JUAN R SANCHEZ
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF RESPOND TO #7 MOTION TO DISMISS BY 3/18/2020. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 2/13/20. 2/14/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED. (va, )
February 13, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by MELANIE COTTOM, THERESA COTTOM. (SHERMAN, DAVID)(FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 2/14/2020 (md).
February 11, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by NIGEL A. GREENE on behalf of SECURITY RESOURCES INC with Certificate of Service(GREENE, NIGEL)
February 5, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by KRISTINE MARIE MEINDL on behalf of RITE AID OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC., with Jury Demand(MEINDL, KRISTINE) Modified on 2/20/2020 (md).
February 3, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by CITY AND COUNTY OF PHILADELPHIA.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(ZABEL, SHANNON)
January 17, 2020 3 Summonses Issued as to RITE AID OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC., RICHARD ROSS, JR., SECURITY RESOURCES INC. 3 Forwarded To: DAVID SHERMAN on 1/21/20. (va, )
January 17, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against CITY AND COUNTY OF PHILADELPHIA, RITE AID OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC., RICHARD ROSS, JR., SECURITY RESOURCES INC, filed by THERESA COTTOM, MELANIE COTTOM.(va, ) (Main Document 6 replaced on 1/21/2020) (va, ).
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF IS GRANTED AN EXTENSION OF TIME, UNTIL 1/20/2020, TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS OR FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 1/13/2020. 1/14/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(amas)
January 13, 2020 Filing 4 STIPULATION for Extension of Time by MELANIE COTTOM, THERESA COTTOM. (SHERMAN, DAVID) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 1/22/2020 (md).
December 30, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CITY AND COUNTY OF PHILADELPHIA.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(ZABEL, SHANNON)
December 27, 2019 Filing 2 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (va, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CITY AND COUNTY OF PHILADELPHIA from COURT OF COMMON PLEAS PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, case number 191100991. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE208703)(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COTTOM et al v. RITE AID OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELANIE COTTOM
Represented By: DAVID SHERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THERESA COTTOM
Represented By: DAVID SHERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY AND COUNTY OF PHILADELPHIA
Represented By: SHANNON G. ZABEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD ROSS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SECURITY RESOURCES INC
Represented By: NIGEL A. GREENE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RITE AID OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC.
Represented By: KRISTINE MARIE MEINDL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?