Dibattista et al v. Merck Co., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Carmine Dibattista and Barbara Dibattista
Defendant: Merck Co., Inc. and MERCK SHARPE & DOHME CORP.
Case Number: 2:2019cv20247
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: HARVEY BARTLE
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 7:19-cv-06579. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 2, 2019 MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - Eastern District of Pennsylvania. (sjo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/2/2019.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - Eastern District of Pennsylvania. (Signed by MDL Panel on 8/1/2019) (sjo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/2/2019.]
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Merck Sharpe & Dohme Corp.. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/2/2019.]
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Merck Co., Inc.. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/2/2019.]
July 16, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/2/2019.]
July 16, 2019 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/2/2019.]
July 16, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/2/2019.]
July 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Virginia Eve Anello. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $10,000,000. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9,999,000. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/2/2019.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Merck Sharpe & Dohme Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Barbara Dibattista, Carmine Dibattista. (Anello, Virginia) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/2/2019.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Merck & Co., Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Barbara Dibattista, Carmine Dibattista. (Anello, Virginia) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/2/2019.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Anello, Virginia) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/2/2019.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Merck Co., Inc., Merck Sharpe & Dohme Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17248286)Document filed by Carmine Dibattista, Barbara Dibattista.(Anello, Virginia) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/2/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dibattista et al v. Merck Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCK SHARPE & DOHME CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmine Dibattista
Represented By: VIRGINIA E ANELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Dibattista
Represented By: VIRGINIA E ANELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?