LEE v. MERCK & CO., INC. et al
Plaintiff: MCKINLEY LEE
Defendant: MCKESSON CORP, MERCK SHARP AND DOHME CORP. and MERCK & CO., INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv20329
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: HARVEY BARTLE
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 3:19-cv-20429. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-49) transferring case to the USDC for the EDPA. (dm ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/5/2019.]
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MCKESSON CORP., MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP AND DOHME CORP.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/5/2019.]
November 18, 2019 Judge Peter G. Sheridan and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (abr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/5/2019.]
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MCKESSON CORP., MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP AND DOHME CORP. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10118913) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MCKINLEY LEE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet CCS, #2 Summons MERCK, #3 Summons MSD, #4 Summons MCKESSON)(CORDNER, MARGARET) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/5/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEE v. MERCK & CO., INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCKINLEY LEE
Represented By: MARGARET CORDNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCKESSON CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCK SHARP AND DOHME CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCK & CO., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?