SHERRY
In Re: PARKER VINCENT SHERRY
Case Number: 2:2019mc00123
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Nature of Suit: Miscellaneous
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT THE RESPONDENT IS SUSPENDED FROM THE PRACTICE OF LAW IN THIS COURT, EFFECTIVE THIRTY DAYS FROM SEPTEMBER 17, 2018, AND UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THIS COURT. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 07/29/19. 07/29/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE. (go,)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER THAT THE RESPONDENT FILE WITH THIS COURT, WITHIN 30 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF SERVICE OF THIS ORDER, AN ANSWER INFORMING THIS COURT OF ANY CLAIM BY THE RESPONDENT, PREDICATED UPON THE GROUNDS SET FORTH IN L.R.C.P. 83.6 11 D, THAT THE IMPOSITION OF IDENTICAL DISCIPLINE BY THIS COURT WOULD BE UNWARRANTED, AND THE REASONS THEREFORE. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 06/14/19. 06/17/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE. (go,)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 Copy of Order from the Supreme Court of Pennsylvania dated September 17, 2018, that the attorneys named on the attached list are administratively suspended pursuant to Rule 219, Pa.R.D.E. Said administrative suspension shall take effect thirty days after the date of this order pursuant to Rule 217(d), Pa.R.D.E. (go,)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: PARKER VINCENT SHERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?