IMAGE MASTERS, INC. et al v. ABN AMRO MORTGAGE GROUP, INC.
Plaintiff: LYNN FELDMAN
Defendant: ABN AMRO MORTGAGE GROUP, INC.
Petitioner: WELLS FARGO HOME MORTGAGE, SUNTRUST BANK, WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., CITIMORTGAGE, INC., PARK GRANADA LLC, BANK OF NEW YORK, FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION, COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, INC., PRINCIPAL RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE and FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
In Re: IMAGE MASTERS, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019mc00131
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL M BAYLSON
Referring Judge: MITCHELL S GOLDBERG
Nature of Suit: Miscellaneous
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF REFERENCE (DOC. 1) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 2/10/20. 2/10/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
February 10, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 2/10/20. 2/10/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
December 12, 2019 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Truist Financial Corporation with Certificate of Service by SUNTRUST BANK.(BRYCE, MARTIN)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference filed by ABN AMRO MORTGAGE GROUP, INC., BANK OF NEW YORK, CITIMORTGAGE, INC., COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, INC., FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION, FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, PARK GRANADA LLC, PRINCIPAL RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE, SUNTRUST BANK, WELLS FARGO HOME MORTGAGE. (HAMERMESH, MATTHEW)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE to Motion re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference filed by LYNN FELDMAN. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(COREN, STEVEN)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON TO HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 6/18/19. 6/19/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by ABN AMRO MORTGAGE GROUP, INC., BANK OF NEW YORK, CITIMORTGAGE, INC., COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, INC., FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION, FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, PARK GRANADA LLC, PRINCIPAL RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE, SUNTRUST BANK, WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., WELLS FARGO HOME MORTGAGE Notice of Related Cases (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(HAMERMESH, MATTHEW)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF REFERENCE OF ADVERSARY PROCEEDINGS filed by ABN AMRO MORTGAGE GROUP, INC., BANK OF NEW YORK, CITIMORTGAGE, COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, INC., FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION, FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, PARK GRANADA LLC, PRINCIPAL RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE, SUNTRUST BANK, WELLS FARGO HOME MORTGAGE, WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., Certificate of Service. Memorandum of Law. ($47, receipt #198967)(jwl, ) Modified on 6/18/2019 (md).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IMAGE MASTERS, INC. et al v. ABN AMRO MORTGAGE GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: WELLS FARGO HOME MORTGAGE
Represented By: MARTIN C. BRYCE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SUNTRUST BANK
Represented By: MARTIN C. BRYCE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Represented By: MARTIN C. BRYCE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CITIMORTGAGE, INC.
Represented By: MATTHEW HAMERMESH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PARK GRANADA LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH F. YENOUSKAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BANK OF NEW YORK
Represented By: JOSEPH F. YENOUSKAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION
Represented By: KENTON W. HAMBRICK
Represented By: ROBERT M. GREENBAUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, INC.
Represented By: JOSEPH F. YENOUSKAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PRINCIPAL RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE
Represented By: MATTHEW HAMERMESH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: MICHAEL J. CORDONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LYNN FELDMAN
Represented By: STEVEN M. COREN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABN AMRO MORTGAGE GROUP, INC.
Represented By: MATTHEW HAMERMESH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: IMAGE MASTERS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?