HAYNES v. SAUL
Plaintiff: MYRA HAYNES
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 2:2020cv00404
Filed: January 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: C DARNELL JONES
Referring Judge: DAVID R STRAWBRIDGE
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2020 Filing 9 US Marshal Return Re:Summons and Complaint Served upon the Commissioner of Social Security on 2/6/20 via FEDEX and the Atty. General on 2/6/20 via FEDEX. See attached receipt. (jaa, )
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE COURT'S STANDING ORDER FOR DIRECT ASSIGNMENT OF SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES PILOT PROGRAM AND PLAINTIFF HAVING DECLINED CONSENT, THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS RANDOMLY REASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 1/31/2020. 1/31/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
January 30, 2020 Filing 7 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (jl, )
January 30, 2020 Filing 6 Social Security Declining Magistrate Consent by MYRA HAYNES.. (IMBESI, STEPHANIE)
January 24, 2020 Filing 5 STANDING Procedural Order 1/27/2020 Entered and copies E-MAILED. (bw, )
January 24, 2020 3 Summons Issued as to ANDREW SAUL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General 2 Forwarded To: U.S. MARSHALS and 1 to US ATTORNEY on 1/27/2020 (bw, ) Modified on 1/28/2020 (afm, ).
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. CLERK OF COURT SHALL ISSUE SUMMONS. U.S. MARSHAL FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONSES AND COMPLAINT.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 1/24/2020.1/24/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw, )
January 22, 2020 Filing 3 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 CONSENT)(bw, )
January 22, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against ANDREW SAUL, filed by MYRA HAYNES.(bw, )
January 22, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by MYRA HAYNES..(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HAYNES v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MYRA HAYNES
Represented By: STEPHANIE M. IMBESI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?